Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Mri Associates Of Brandon Llc,GRIFFIN, GRACE vs Geico Indemnity Company
On February 21, 2024 a sc personal injury protection-tier 1 $0.00-$99.99 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Martin, Richard. H presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 21, 2024
Last Refreshed
February 25, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Feb 22, 2024General Differentiated Case Management Order
Date: Feb 22, 2024REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: Feb 21, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Feb 21, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Feb 21, 2024NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: Feb 21, 2024REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: Feb 21, 2024E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Feb 21, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED | |
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Order | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Applies | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM |