Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK vs MILLINER-WALTERS, TIESHA T
On February 21, 2024 a sc debt owed-tier 5 $5,000.01-$8,000.00 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Murphy, J. Logan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 21, 2024
Last Refreshed
February 25, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Judge
Hon. Murphy, J. Logan
Category
Civil
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET
Date: Feb 22, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Feb 21, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Feb 21, 2024REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: Feb 21, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM |