Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BMF IV FL Carrollwood Station LLC vs Vasquez, Diego
On February 21, 2024 a lt residential eviction- possession only case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Murphy, J. Logan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
February 21, 2024
Last Refreshed
February 25, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Judge
Hon. Murphy, J. Logan
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Feb 23, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Feb 21, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Feb 21, 2024E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Feb 21, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED |