Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LVNV Funding LLC vs Allen, Michael
On January 31, 2024 a sc debt owed-tier 3 $500.01-$2,500.00 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Martin, Richard. H presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2024
Last Refreshed
February 04, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NO SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Feb 01, 2024DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: Jan 31, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Jan 31, 2024E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Jan 31, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jan 31, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | NO SUMMONS ISSUED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM |