Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK vs HEYWARD, SHAWN
On January 31, 2024 a cc debt owed $8,000.01 to $15,000.00 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Smith, Matthew. A presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2024
Last Refreshed
February 04, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Feb 01, 2024General Differentiated Case Management Order
Date: Feb 01, 2024REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)
Date: Jan 31, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jan 31, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Jan 31, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Order | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Applies |