Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
AMH NB DEVELOPMENT CHATHAM WALK FL LLC vs LUMPKIN, HEZEKIAH
On January 31, 2024 a lt residential eviction/past due rent $0.00-$15,000.00 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Chandler, Cory presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 17, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Judge
Hon. Chandler, Cory
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Dismissal
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT 1 - EVICTION
COUNT II - DAMAGES
Case Complaint Summary
The complaint filed in the County Court for the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in Hillsborough County, Florida, by AMH NB Development Chatham Walk FL, LLC against Hezekiah Lumpkin involves eviction and damages due to unpaid rent. The complaint detai…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: Mar 13, 2024WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED NOT SERVED
Date: Mar 07, 2024WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED
Date: Feb 23, 2024E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: Feb 22, 2024DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK
Date: Feb 20, 2024MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
Date: Feb 16, 2024Signature Page For Clerks Default
Date: Feb 16, 2024MOTION
Date: Feb 16, 2024AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED
Date: Feb 14, 2024CORRESPONDENCE
Date: Feb 08, 2024CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Date: Feb 08, 2024E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Feb 01, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Jan 31, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 31, 2024E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Jan 31, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Jan 31, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jan 31, 2024DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS
Date: Jan 31, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED NOT SERVED | |
February 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED ORDER SIGNED ON 02/21/2024 |
|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
February 21, 2024 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION | |
February 20, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Signature Page For Clerk's Default | |
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR TENANT REMOVAL |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE, NOT ATTACHED |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED HEZEKIAH LUMPKIN - 02/08/2024 |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TO THE CLERK |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS |