Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GOLDEN GATE CHIROPRACTIC CENTER, INC,LOPEZ, SHERLYN vs OCEAN HARBOR CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
On January 31, 2024 a sc personal injury protection-tier 1 $0.00-$99.99 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Smith, Matthew. A presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 31, 2024
Last Refreshed
May 17, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Personal Injury
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS
Date: Mar 13, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: Feb 28, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Jan 31, 2024E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Jan 31, 2024General Differentiated Case Management Order
Date: Jan 31, 2024E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Jan 31, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jan 31, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Order | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Applies | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF CLAIM |