Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Clipper Bay Associates Ltd vs Almaguer, Emonnie
On January 23, 2024 a lt residential eviction- possession only case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Murphy, J. Logan presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 23, 2024
Last Refreshed
January 27, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Judge
Hon. Murphy, J. Logan
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Jan 24, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jan 23, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Jan 23, 2024E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Jan 23, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic |