Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Garcia, Edith Agosto vs UNIVERSAL PROPERTY and CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
On April 10, 2024 a breach of contract case was filed by Garcia, Edith Agosto, represented by Wulwick , Jonathan D., against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Alvarez, Lindsay. M presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 10, 2024
Last Refreshed
April 14, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I - BREACH OF CONTRACT
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint involves a legal case filed by Plaintiff, Edith Agosto Garcia, against Defendant, Universal Property & Casualty Insurance Company. The action is for damages greater than fifty-one thousand Dollars ($51,000.00) due to property damag…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
General Differentiated Case Management Order
Date: Apr 11, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Apr 10, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: Apr 10, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Apr 10, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Order | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Applies |