Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
THE GARRISON ASSOCIATION, INC. vs ANCI ROOFING AND CONTRACTING, LLC
On January 23, 2024 a breach of contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Polo, Melissa. M. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 23, 2024
Last Refreshed
January 27, 2024
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT II CIVIL CONVERSION
Case Complaint Summary
This legal document involves a complaint filed by The Garrison Association, Inc. against ANCI Roofing and Contracting, LLC. The complaint alleges that ANCI failed to pay Sims Crane & Equipment Co., resulting in damages to The Garrison. The compla…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
General Differentiated Case Management Order
Date: Jan 24, 2024E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: Jan 24, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: Jan 23, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: Jan 23, 2024REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)
Date: Jan 23, 2024E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Jan 23, 2024Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Order | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | General Differentiated Case Management Applies | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic |