Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Rodriguez, Juan vs CLARK, DEBORAH
On August 06, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by Rodriguez, Juan, against Clark, Deborah, and Clark, Emily, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Judge, Senior presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 06, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Judge
Hon. Judge, Senior
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
April 09, 2019 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION | |
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY PLAINTIFF'S- TO DEFENDANTS- NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES PLAINTIFF'S |
|
December 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NO SUBPOENAS ATTACHED 17X - NO SUBP ATTACHED |
|
September 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION PLAINTIFF'S - DEFENDANT'S |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - NOT ATTACHED |
|
September 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES - NOT ATTACHED |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF |
|
August 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY GARRETT M. BROWN FROM NOVEMBER 12, 2018 THROUGH DECEMBER 3, 2018 & MARCH 1, 2019 THROUGH MARCH 29, 2019 |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
August 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X 2 Service@juliansanchezlaw |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) |