Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DISCOVER BANK vs SUCHINI, PATRICIA L
On August 06, 2018 contract & indebtedness case was filed by Discover Bank, against Suchini, Patricia L, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Stoddard, C.. Ralph presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 06, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Contract & Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED PATRICIA L. SUCHINI |
|
January 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
E-FILED ALIAS 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED X 1 FloridaLitigation@Zwickerpc |
|
January 03, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED PATRICIA L SUCHINI |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - FloridaLitigation@Zwickerpc |
|
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
August 06, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET |