Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LAIN, LASHEA DENISE vs TAMPA EXPRESS SHUTTLE, INC.
On April 02, 2018 an auto negligence case was filed by Lain, Lashea Denise, and Jackson, Thomeya Monique, against Tampa Express Shuttle, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Battles, L. Emmett presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Auto Negligence
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event | SRS REOPEN EVENT | |
March 18, 2019 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT | |
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE CONSOLIDATED TO 17-CA-9405 PER ORDER DATED 11/6/18 RAN |
|
November 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
DO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS CONSOLIDATED INTO 17-CA-9405 PER ORDER DATED 11/6/18 RAN |
|
November 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION WITH CASE NOS. 17-CA-009405, 17-CA-011297 AND 18-CA-002961 SHALL BE CONSOLIDATED FOR ALL PURPOSES INCLUDING DISCOVERY AND TRIAL **GRANTED** 11/06/18 RAN |
|
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES VERIFIED |
|
September 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED 9X, SUBPS NOT ATTACHED |
|
August 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES UNVERIFIED |
|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED 9X, NO SUBPS ATTACHED |
|
August 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER COMPELLING **EX-PARTE** PLTF HAS FAILED TO RESPOND AND NOW MUST RESPOND W/IN TEN (10) DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE PLAINTIFF'S |
|
July 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES UNVERIFIED |
|
June 28, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
May 03, 2018 | Docket Event | REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
May 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MATTHEW R. EASTERWOOD, ESQ. OF THE LAW FIRM OF BANKER LOPEZ GASSLER P.A. |
|
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
April 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED TAMPA EXPRESS SHUTTLE, INC. C/O UPIA FELIX, 4/12/18 |
|
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - DWKPleadings@forthepeople.com ; CWills@forthepeople |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic |