Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Bank of Tampa vs Promocom Services, Inc.
On April 02, 2018 contract & indebtedness case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Huey, L. Paul presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Contract & Indebtedness
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED FINAL JUDGMENT | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL GARNISHMENT JUDGMENT- ATTACHED |
|
January 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISSOLVE WRIT OF GARNISHMENT DEFENDANT'S - OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, TO DETERMINE PRIORITY OF LIENS |
|
January 11, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE | |
January 10, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE | |
December 20, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE | |
December 19, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE | |
December 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE WRIT OF OF GARINSHMENT |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED BAYSHORE TITLE COMPANY/BAYSHORE TITLE INSURANCE AGENCY, LLC / LANDCASTLE GROUP, LLC 12/6/2018 |
|
December 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT ISSUED sftlaw@verizon |
|
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | E-FILED MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO DEFENDANT | |
November 30, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
November 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL LOAN DOCUMENTS - NOT ATTACHED |
|
October 08, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AGAINST DFDT'S |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING FEE AFFIDAVITS - NOT ATTACHED |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES REASONABLE |
|
September 21, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
September 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT SUMMARY - AND AWARD OF ATTYS' FEES AND COSTS AGAINST DFDT AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES PLAINTIFF'S |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S - DEFENDANT'S DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
|
September 07, 2018 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY THE COURT AGAINST BRUCE J. BISHOP, JR. / EXHIBIT(S) ATTACHED |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT **DENIED** 08/15/18 PLH |
|
August 16, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT | |
August 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING PLTFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF ATTYS' FEES AND COSTS AGAINST DFDTS AND DFDT'S MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
August 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AGAINST DEFENDANTS, PROMOCOM SERVICES, INC AND EXTREME MOTORCAR OF TAMPA, INC. |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK NOTIFYING PARTIES OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO DIVISION I |
|
July 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF RECUSAL REASSIGNED TO DIVISION I, JUDGE HUEY -- 07/31/18 MJC |
|
July 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING DEFENDANT BRUCE J. BISHOP'S MOTION TO DISMISS |
|
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
July 23, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS - THOMAS F BAKER II, ESQ. |
|
July 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BRUCE J BISHOP, JR, 7/02/18, INDIVIDUALLY |
|
June 11, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEE AND COSTS AGAINST THE DEFENDANTS |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING FEE AFFIDAVITS |
|
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES | |
June 01, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT PLAINTIFF'S - DEFAULT - AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS AGAINST DEFENDANTS |
|
May 04, 2018 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK | |
May 01, 2018 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK | |
April 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED PROMOCOM SERVICES, INC., 4/4/18 |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X3 - brobertson@thompsonclg |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic |