Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Brockman, Dexter vs Security First Insurance Company
On April 02, 2018 a breach of contract case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Fuson, F. Robin presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 02, 2018
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Breach of Contract
Practice Area
Commercial
Matter Type
Breach of Contract
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR DEFENDANT S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE S DEPOSITION, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE SCOPE OF THE DEPOSITION |
|
October 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW AS TO THE DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT S FIELD ADJUSTER |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO QUASH DEFENDANT'S- PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEFENDANT'S CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE'S DEPOSITION, OR ALTERNATIVELY, MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER TO LIMIT THE SCOPE OF THE DEPOSITION |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER DEFENDANT'S- AS TO DEFENDANT'S DESK ADJUSTER |
|
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SANCTIONS | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S- DEPOSITION DATES OF DEFENDANT'S DESK ADJUSTER AND FIELD ADJUSTER |
|
July 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND |
|
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
July 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
REQUEST DEFENDANT S - FOR ENTRY UPON LAND |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES, BETTER RESPONSES TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE AND MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANT'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY |
|
June 04, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
May 14, 2019 | Docket Event | PRIVILEGE LOG | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
May 13, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
April 25, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING | |
April 24, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING | |
April 16, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE | |
April 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION/REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND (SIGNED BY JUDGE FLEMING 4/9/2019) |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT S INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
|
March 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO - FOR REQUEST FOR ENTRY UPON LAND |
|
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 13, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
January 15, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PLT MOTION TO COMPEL BETTER DISCOVERY RESPONSES |
|
October 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AMENDED NOTICE OF |
|
August 22, 2018 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY DEFENDANT S NOTICE OF - PLAINTIFF S |
|
August 14, 2018 | Docket Event |
AMENDED MOTION TO - FOR PLT - COMPEL BETTER ANSWERS TO INTERROGS, BETTER RESPONSES TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE AND MOTION TO OVERRULE DEF OBJECTIONS TO PLT DISCOVERY |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL PLT - BETTER ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES, BETTER RESPONSES TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE AND MOTION TO OVERRULE DEFENDANT S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY |
|
August 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED 1X, SUB ATTACHED, COS 8/13/18; CORRESPONDENCE |
|
July 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY ANDRICK BERNARD LEWIS, ESQ., FROM 09/20/18-10/08/18 |
|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | PRIVILEGE LOG | |
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DEFENDANT S - TO PLAINTIFFS |
|
May 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME DEFENDANT S - TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCOVERY |
|
April 26, 2018 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |
|
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; ELECTRONIC DELIVERY OF SUMMONS ON 4/6/18 TO SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY BY CFO OF THE STATE OF FLORIDA - ATTACHED |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) EAST |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 - MArvin@nationlaw.com ; alewis@nationlaw |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF CORRESPONDENCE |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | File Home Location - Electronic |