Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
SUNCOAST CREDIT UNION vs HERNANDEZ, WILLIAM R
On January 26, 2016 contract & indebtedness case was filed by Suncoast Credit Union, against Hernandez, William R, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Thomas, K. Cheryl presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
January 26, 2016
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ON - TO - FOR | |
June 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR REMOVAL OF CASE FROM LACK OF PROSECUTION CALENDAR AND TO ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE CASE |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION 3/7/16 CKT |
|
March 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR PAYMENTS AND TO WITHHOLD JUDGEMENT |
|
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED WILLIAM HERNANDEZ 02/03/16 |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed) | |
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING) | |
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA | |
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X 1 collectionsservice@kasslaw |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |