Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
METLIFE HOME LOANS VS EST OF HARRIS;D
On December 10, 2010 a mortgage foreclosure - homestead -2- $50,001 - $249,999 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 10, 2010
Last Refreshed
December 01, 2023
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Judge
Hon. Div M, Senior Judge
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Documents
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Date: Jun 15, 2015E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: Jan 08, 2015MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: Aug 06, 2014Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RETURN OF ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 04, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
ASSIGNMENT OF BID TO FEDERAL NATIONAL MORTGAGE ASSOCIATION C/O CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY 8950 CYPRESS WATERS BLVD COPPELL, TX 75019 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 31, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 15, 2015 | Docket Event |
Per FJ / Order Assignment of Bid Authorized
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK AS TO AMENDED COMPLAINT Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 20, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK ATTORNEY: MINDY CLARKE ESQ. RE: THEIR IS NO CONFIDENTAL INFO. ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED - ORIGINAL NOTE & MORTGAGE (RECEIVED 3/27/15) Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND TAXATION OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS WITH SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS AND AFFIDAVIT OF TIME, EFFORT & COSTS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED TO AN ELECTRONIC FILE Paper converted electronically and destroyed in accordance with minimum standards for image reproduction in Rules 1B-26.0021 and 1B-26.003, Florida Administrative Code and Record (master) copy requirements set forth in Section 92.29, Florida Statutes Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 23, 2015 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT 1/15/15 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 08, 2015 | Docket Event |
E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED X1 MAIL@RASFLAW Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF PROCESS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 31, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR PLT'S MOTN TO QUASH SERVICE PROCESS- GRANTED- 12/31/14 SAT Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL AND FOR IMPOSITION OF ATTY'S LIENS - GRANTED - ST 09/23/14 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY COUNSEL FOR PLTF Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 12, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF MICHELLE LEWIS, ESQ. AS CO COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 06, 2014 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS ATTY AND FOR IMPOSITION OF ATTYS LIENS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 23, 2014 | Docket Event |
CASE IMAGE AND VERIFIED AS OF THIS DATE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PLTF AND AMENDING CASE STYLE - NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC DBA CHAMPION MORTGAGE COMPANY SHALL BE SUBSTITUTED AS THE PLTF 08/12/13 JRP Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF THAT BUTLER AND HOSCH, P.A IS SUBSTITUTED IN PLACE OF SPEAR AND HOFFMAN, P.A. FOR PLAINTIFF..........03/14/13 DCE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL BUTLER & HOSCH PA IN LIEU OF SPEAR AND HOFFMAN PA AS COUNSEL FOR PLTF METLIFE HOME LOANS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE MARK A. BUCKLES, ESQ. Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AND ATTORNEY OF RECORD - MARK A BUCKLES, ESQ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
OATH OF GUARDIAN, ADMINISTRATOR AND ATTORNEY AD LITEM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTY FEES AND MEMORANDUM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PLTF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S) JOHN DOE AND MARY DOE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 06, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM FOR UNKNOWN HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION THE UNK HEIRS, DEVISEES, GRANTEES AND CREDITORS OF DEROTHA HARRIS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES, AND CREDITORS OF DEROTHA HARRIS (DECEASED) Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ACTION COPY SENT TO NEWSPAPER GULF COAST BUSINESS REVIEW: ON OR BEFORE DATE: APRIL 9, 2012 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED MARVIN DAVIS ON 07/11/11 - 30 DAYS. USER ID=WOODYARDMA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X1. USER ID=STAFORDM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 08-JUL-2011,$10.00, User Id = STAFORDM, Receipt No = 2077419. USER ID=STAFORDM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 06, 2011 | Docket Event |
AMENDMENT COMPLAINT. USER ID=STAFORDM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF BORROWER NON PARTICIPATION USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED MARY DOE. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 12/17/10 SECRETARY OF HOUSING AND URBAN DEVELOPMENT. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DEROTHA HARRIS. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 03, 2011 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JOHN DOE. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 13-DEC-2010,$955.00, User Id = DIETZ, Receipt No = 1954184. USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 13, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X4. USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
NO FORM A FILED USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 10, 2010 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |