Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC BANK USA VS RUANGSORN;U
On November 09, 2009 a mortgage foreclosure case was filed by Hsbc Bank Usa, Na As Trustee On Behalf Of The Ace Securities Corp Home Equity Loan Trust, against Ruangsorn, Udorn, and Ruangsorn, Ka, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Bergmann, E. Charles presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 09, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 16, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
October 31, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ W/CHECK No. 0011916. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED RUANGSORN, KA 12/02/09. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JOHN DOE. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JANE DOE. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED RUANGSORN, UDORN 12/02/09. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X 4. USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 18-NOV-2009,$946.00, User Id = PHILLIPSV, Receipt No = 1702764. USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |