Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
ENCOMPASS FLORIDIAN INS CO VS FORD MOTOR CO
On November 03, 2009 an other negligence case was filed by Encompass Floridian Ins Co, against Ford Motor Credit Co Llc1200 S Pine Island Rd, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Bergmann, E. Charles presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 03, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Negligence
Status
Removal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RUMMEL Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING OF Notice of Removal TO FEDERAL COURT. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Removal TO FEDERAL COURT USER ID=AYALAY Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
DO NOT ENTER ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS USER ID=AYALAY Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
January 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF FORD MOTOR COMPANY. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X1. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 06-NOV-2009,$410.00, User Id = ARROYOL, Receipt No = 1695981. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |