Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
JIMENEZ-RAMOS;J VS ALLSTATE PROPERTY & CASUALTY
On October 22, 2009 an auto negligence case was filed by Jimenez-Ramos, Jesus, and Jimenez-Ramos, Ana, against Allstate Property And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Wolfe, Mark presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 22, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event | FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC | |
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. |
|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ |
|
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL W/PREJ. USER ID=MARTNEZ |
|
November 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISMISS SETTLEMENT AFTER HEARING W/PREJ 11/08/10 MJC. USER ID=MARTNEZ |
|
October 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECOND SUPLEMENTAL. USER ID=KANTAKDE |
|
September 29, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 11/3/2010 @ 9:00. USER ID=LOPEZSO |
|
September 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS USER ID=KANTAKDE |
|
September 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED RC AVMED HEALTH PLANS SERVED HEATHER REIBSOME. USER ID=MALLARDJ |
|
August 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION USER ID=DIGGSL |
|
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE AMENDED 09/17/10 @ 12:00 AM. USER ID=MARTNEZ |
|
July 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED COS 07/12/2010 X1. USER ID=MALLARDJ |
|
July 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES AND RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE. USER ID=MANNTI |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (SUPPLEMENTAL). USER ID=MCKENZIEA |
|
June 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES USER ID=MCKENZIEA |
|
June 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C NERMIN BECIRBASIC. USER ID=BLACKMANJU |
|
June 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE USER ID=VIRGILS |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED RC: FOR TAMPA BAY CHIRO. 03/31/10. USER ID=VIRGILS |
|
May 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION USER ID=DIGGSL |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED X'S 1/COS DATE APRIL 21, 2010. USER ID=GRAHAMD |
|
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED RC: FOR CARLOS PAGAN 03/22/10. USER ID=VIRGILS |
|
April 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 06/02/2010 9 AM. USER ID=MALLARDJ |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C PORT CONSOLIDATED INC. USER ID=MCKENZIEA |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C PENN TANK LINES. USER ID=MCKENZIEA |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C LAND O LAKES CHIROPRACTIC. USER ID=MCKENZIEA |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C KENAN TRANSPORT. USER ID=MCKENZIEA |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C DR ROBERT MARTINEZ. USER ID=MCKENZIEA |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C BAY AREA IMAGING OPEN MRI. USER ID=MCKENZIEA |
|
April 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED R/C ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY PIP. USER ID=MCKENZIEA |
|
March 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION AND COMPLIANCE WITH HIPAA. USER ID=BLACKMANJU |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING ASIDE DEFAULT ON AGREED LIFTING DEFAULT AGAINST DEFT. 3/9/10 BCS. USER ID=MAHER |
|
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
JOINT STIPULATION TO LIFT DEFAULT. USER ID=MAHER |
|
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED X9 SUBS ATTACHED. USER ID=VIRGILS |
|
March 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR COPIES USER ID=MCKENZIEA |
|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE USER ID=TUCKERTO |
|
February 09, 2010 | Docket Event |
ANSWER TO INTERROGATORIES USER ID=TUCKERTO |
|
January 15, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL USER ID=NEWSOMEF |
|
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS USER ID=BLACKMANJU |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION USER ID=BLACKMANJU |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS USER ID=BLACKMANJU |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES USER ID=BLACKMANJU |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. USER ID=NEWSOMEF |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C1505 - NOTICE SERV CONSORTIUM INTERR. USER ID=BLACKMANJU |
|
December 21, 2009 | Docket Event |
ANSWER ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. USER ID=NEWSOMEF |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INS. CO.. USER ID=MAHER |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C402 - SHERIFFS RETURN OF SERVICE ON . DEFT. ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INS. CO. 10/26/09. USER ID=MAHER |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X 1. USER ID=TRICE |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE USER ID=TRICE |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES USER ID=TRICE |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 22-OCT-2009,$410.00, User Id = TRICE, Receipt No = 1684459. USER ID=TRICE |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=TRICE |
|
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=TRICE |