Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
RAILROAD & INDUSTRIAL FEDERAL C U VS GROSS;J
On September 28, 2009 a replevin case was filed by Railroad & Industrial Federal Credit Union, against Gross, Justin G, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Isom, R. Claudia presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 28, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
Collections
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR ORDER MTN FOR ENTRY OF ORDER OF DISCHARGE. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
August 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER ON - TO - FOR MTN FOR DISCHARGE 08/11/10 MS CC TO ACCT. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
BANKRUPTCY JUSTIN G GROSS. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED GROSS, JUSTIN G. 04/22/10. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF REPLEVIN RETURNED SERVED GROSS, JUSTIN G. 04/22/10. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
PLURIES SUMMONS ISSUED X1. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED PER FINAL JUDGMENT FROM 4/05/10 MJC. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 08-APR-2010,$10.00, User Id = ARROYOL, Receipt No = 1796842. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED PLURIES PER ORDER DTD 3/23/10 DMS RETURNED TO ATTY IN ENVELOPE PROVIDED. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON SERVICE JUSTIN G. GROSS ALIAS WRIT OF REPLEVIN. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 24, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE PLURIUS PRE-JUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN 03/23/10 MS. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE ARTHUR S. CORRALES, ESQ.. USER ID=KINGJU Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 04-MAR-2010,$10.00, User Id = HIPSON, Receipt No = 1773130. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED X1. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
March 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTY IN ENVELOPE PROVIDED. USER ID=HIPSON Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
February 26, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE ALIAS PRE-JUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVIN 02/25/10 MS. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED GROSS, JUSTIN G. 11/09/09 UNEXECUTED. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED GROSS, JUSTIN G.. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 03-NOV-2009,$8.50, User Id = ARROYOL, Receipt No = 1692483. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
LETTER FROM CLERK ARTHUR S CORRALES, ESQ.. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 27, 2009 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF REPLEVIN ISSUED PER ORDER FROOM 10/05/09 RCS TO ATTY ARTHUR S CORRALES. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
BREAK ORDER REPLEVING 10/07/09 RCS. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE PRE-JUDGMENT WRIT OF REPLEVING 10/05/09 RCS. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
PETITION FOR WRIT OF REPLEVIN USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 28-SEP-2009,$495.00, User Id = ARROYOL, Receipt No = 1667659. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
SURETY BOND APPROVED ORIGINAL IN FILE USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |
|
September 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X1. USER ID=ARROYOL Judge: Isom, R. Claudia |