Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
H & R BLOCK BANK VS O'GARRO;J
On September 22, 2009 a mortgage foreclosure case was filed by H&R Block Bank, against O'Garro, John, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 22, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Judge
Hon. Div M, Senior Judge
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 19, 2014 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE New File Sent to R/C Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF MAILING
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
Fee Worksheet
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event |
BID INFORMATION SHEET
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 24, 2013 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE BUSINESS OBSERVER Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 19, 2013 | Docket Event |
COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
Per FJ / Order Assignment of Bid Authorized
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIG ATTAC AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL AND DESIGNATIONO F EMAIL ADDRESS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 04, 2013 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME CHOICE LEGAL GROUP PA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLTF MICHELLE ZELINA, ESQ. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE LAW OFFICES OF MARSHALL C WATSON, PA RE: NOTICE OF LEAD COUNSEL FOR PLTF. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 23, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE ORLANDO DELUCA, ESQ.. USER ID=KINGJU Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 3/29/11 @ 1:30 PM. USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 04, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE ORLANDO DELUCA, ESQ. RE PLEADING FILED. USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT SUPPORTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT ATTACHED. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE DANIELLE LEVIN. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C1487 - MTN SUMM JGMNT W/ATCHD AFFDVTS. USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE HEIDI REINIG, L/A...MOT SFJ/AFFS. USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED JOHN O'GARRO; UNKNOWN TENANTS NKA STACY HENDERSON. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE DAVID J. BERGER...AFF OF COMPLIANCE. USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHED NOTE; RECORDED MTG; COPY RECORDED ASSIGN OF MTG.. USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE HEIDI REINIG. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 9/29/09 JOHN O'GARRO. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 9/28/09 UNKNOWN TENANTS NKA STACY HENDERSON. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 23-SEP-2009,$925.00, User Id = PHILLIPSV, Receipt No = 1664972. USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X 2. USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS USER ID=PHILLIPSV Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |