Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
CITIMORTGAGE INC VS DAVIS;M
On September 22, 2009 a mortgage foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 22, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Judge
Hon. Div M, Senior Judge
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event |
INFORMATION ONLY: Imaging Prep Complete - Round 2
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING NON-JURY TRIAL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 27, 2015 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED TO AN ELECTRONIC FILE Paper converted electronically and destroyed in accordance with minimum standards for image reproduction in Rules 1B-26.0021 and 1B-26.003, Florida Administrative Code and Record (master) copy requirements set forth in Section 92.29, Florida Statutes Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 21, 2013 | Docket Event |
CASE IMAGE AND VERIFIED AS OF THIS DATE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
JUDGE'S COPIES OF PLEADINGS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL AND NON JURY TRIAL NJT 6/4/12 9AM, PT 4/24/12 1115AM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING FEBRUARY 22, 2012 3PM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TANYA SPEARS. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S) JOHN DOE AND JANE DOE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event |
AMENDED COMPLAINT COS 02/16/2010. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF RECORDED ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE ATCHD. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE JILL LIBERTO. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO DISMISS MICHAEL DAVIS. USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF RENAISSANCE VILLAS CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JOHN DOE. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED JANE DOE. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DAVIS, MICHAEL 10/01/09. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED DAVIS, MARLENE 10/01/09. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED RENAISSANCE VILLAS CONDO ASSN INC 09/30/09. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 23-SEP-2009,$956.00, User Id = DIETZ, Receipt No = 1664365. USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X5. USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |