Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
GMAC MORTGAGE VS PADILLA;C
On September 02, 2009 a mortgage foreclosure case was filed by Gmac Mortgage Corp, against Padilla, Carlos, and Padilla, Carmen, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Silver, C. Bernard presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 02, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT Destruction Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
July 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
March 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
December 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=TURNERJE Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS W/O PREJ W/CHECK No. 146377. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
December 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED PADILLA, CARLOS. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED PADILLA, CARMEN. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN TENANTS. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 04-SEP-2009,$935.00, User Id = DIETZ, Receipt No = 1652073. USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X3. USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |
|
September 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=DIETZ Judge: Silver, C. Bernard |