Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DEUTSCHE BANK VS ZELLER;C
On September 01, 2009 a mortgage foreclosure case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Div M, Senior Judge presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 01, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Judge
Hon. Div M, Senior Judge
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Active
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2016 | Docket Event |
UNCLAIMED FUNDS SENT TO FINE & FORFEITURE ACCT PER FS 116.21
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal to be sent to the R/C is in a box by the R/C pick up area. Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 14, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS RETURNED PER ORDER ORIG NOTE AND MORTGAGE MAILED TO: CHOICE LEGAL GROUP P A 1800 NW 49TH STREET STE 120 FT LAUDERDALE FL 33309-9892 PER ORD SIGNED 01/10/13 DCE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 11, 2013 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL RONALD R WOLFE & ASSOCIATES PL FOR PLTF / GRANTED 12-20-2012 RCP Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME RONALD R WOLFE & ASSOCIATES PL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 19, 2012 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES - MICHELLE ZELINA, ESQ. Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
ORDER TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL MARSHALL C WATSON PA FOR PLTF / ORDERED 12-13-2012 RCP Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING TRANSFER CASES FROM RONALD R. WOLFE & ASSOC., P.L. TO THE LAW OFFICES OF MARSHALL C WATSON, P.A. - ATTACHED Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF COUNSEL FLORIDA CONSUMER LAW CENTER, P.A., 5201 W. KENNEDY BLVD., SUITE 215, TAMPA, FL 33609 Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 26, 2012 | Docket Event |
DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
April 27, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING 05/30/2012 3:30 PM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
March 05, 2012 | Docket Event |
BANKRUPTCY
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 28, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING 05/30/2012 3:30 PM Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION PLNTF Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
February 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
NOTICE THAT PLNTF HAS RESPONDED TO DFNT(S) DISCOVERY REQUEST Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 28, 2011 | Docket Event |
JUDICIAL SALE CANCELLED
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO SET ASIDE FINAL JUDGMENT - FINAL ORDER AND CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 20, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASE REOPENED $50 FEE ASSESSED
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 09, 2011 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
COPY OF MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER AND MOTION FOR REHEARING Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM ORDER AND MOTION FOR REHEARING Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT MAILED TO ALL PARTIES
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SALE COPY SENT TO NEWSPAPER LA GACETA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 19-OCT-2011,$108.50, User Id = WIGGSJ, Receipt No = 2132139. USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event |
CASH BOND APPROVED ORIGINAL IN FILE USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 17, 2011 | Docket Event |
NON RESIDENT $100 COST BOND USER ID=WIGGSJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF CHUCK R ZELLER AND MELISSA A ZELLER. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 29, 2011 | Docket Event |
INTERROGATORIES DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER GRANTING DEFTS MTN TO FILE AND AMENDED RESPONSE 30 DAYS 09/20/11 JMB. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 30, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO AMEND DEFENDANTS PROSE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD. USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR DEFT, CHARLES ZELLER AND MELISSA ZELLER CHARLES W CADRECHA, ESQ. USER ID=MANGUALLI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 04, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE USER ID=SOMERSEL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 18, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFF AS TO AMTS DUE AND OWING...ATTCHD. USER ID=SOMERSEL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 14, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE RE AFF OF INDEBTEDNESS. USER ID=KANTAKDE Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
August 11, 2010 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINSTRATIVE ORDER. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFF AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING ATTCHD. USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
July 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE WITH FORECLOSURE PROCEDURES USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE AND OWING. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
December 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL MORTGAGE AND NOTE ATCHD. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION PLTF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE TERRESA JIMENEZ CLA. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES ATTACHED. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES REASONABLE. USER ID=MALLARDJ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
ANSWER WACHOVIA BANK NA. USER ID=NEWSOMEF Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C1487 - MTN SUMM JGMNT W/ATCHD AFFDVTS. USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE CHARLES R ZELLER AND MELISSA A ZELLER. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
November 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE MACKINNON LAW GROUP PA. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING LOAN MODIFICATION COPY ATCHD. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 09, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED WACHOVIA BANK NA. USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
October 06, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL TENANT 1 TENANT 2 TENANT 3 AND TENANT 4 ANY AN ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING W/O PREJ. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 9/9/09 CARROLLWOOD CROSSING PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF CARROLLWOOD CROSSING PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED 09/10/09 WACHOVIA BANK NA. USER ID=BLACKMANJU Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE CONLEY, MALLEY AND GOLSON PA. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
ANSWER CHARLES R ZELLER. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 15, 2009 | Docket Event |
ANSWER MELISSA A ZELLER. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ZELLER, MELISSA A. 09/07/09. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ZELLER, CHARLES R. 09/07/09. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TENANT 1. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 11, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TENANT 2. USER ID=MCKENZIEA Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 04-SEP-2009,$1975.00, User Id = LOPREST, Receipt No = 1651785. USER ID=LOPREST Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X 6. USER ID=LOPREST Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=LOPREST Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
VALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM USER ID=LOPREST Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=LOPREST Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |
|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS USER ID=LOPREST Judge: Div M, Senior Judge |