Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WELLS FARGO BANK NA VS LANGDON;L
On May 28, 2009 a mortgage foreclosure case was filed by Wells Fargo Bank, against Langdon, Lyncia M, and Hampton Park Townhome Asn Inc, in the jurisdiction of Hillsborough County, FL. Judge Bergmann, E. Charles presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
May 28, 2009
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Hillsborough County, FL
Category
Civil
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 27, 2018 | Docket Event |
CASE FILE DESTROYED File destroyed in accordance with retention requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.430 Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE PLACED IN DESTRUCTION AREA PENDING 107
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO REQUESTING DEPARTMENT DESTRUCTION TEAM Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE AT RECORDS CENTER - GIVE TO DESTRUCTION TEAM
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
FILE DESTRUCTION - ENTERING PROCESS
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
February 18, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE RECEIVED IN HOME LOCATION - RC
Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
February 12, 2013 | Docket Event |
FILE SENT TO RECORDS CENTER FOR STORAGE Circuit Civil New Disposal in Transit to the R/C. Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
February 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT CLOSE - CASE STATUS UPDATED. USER ID=RODRIGZ Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
February 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION FORM USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
February 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/O PREJ W/CHECK No. 701498. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
August 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT C1487 - MTN SUMM JGMNT W/ATCHD AFFDVTS. AFFIDAVITS ATTACHED ARE COPIES. USER ID=MANNTI Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
CORRESPONDENCE USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ENTERED LYNCIA M LANGDON. USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE USER ID=DIGGSL Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
August 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LYNCIA M LANGDON W/O PREJ. USER ID=BLACKMANJU Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL TENANT 1 TENANT 2 TENANT 3 AND TENANT 4 ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING W/O PREJ. USER ID=MARTNEZ Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
ANSWER AND DEFENSES OF HAMPTON PARK TOWNHOME ASSOCIATION INC. USER ID=GRAHAMD Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TENANT # 2. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED HAMPTON PARK TOWNHOME ASN INC ON 06/01/09 @ 5PM. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LYNCIA M. LANGDON. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TENANT # 1. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 19, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED LANGDON, LYNCIA M. ON 06/04/09 @ 3:55PM. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING/ ATTACHED. USER ID=VIRGILS Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING USER ID=LANEYG Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNT DUE USER ID=LANEYG Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
CONVERTED EVENT RCPT - RECEIPT. 29-MAY-2009,$357.50, User Id = KRUMMERB, Receipt No = 1579991. USER ID=KRUMMERB Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED X5. USER ID=KRUMMERB Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
LIS PENDENS USER ID=KRUMMERB Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET USER ID=KRUMMERB Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |
|
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT USER ID=KRUMMERB Judge: Bergmann, E. Charles |