Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
282020DR000628FCAXMX
A Domestic Relations/Family 16-E case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Highlands County, FL. Judge BEATO, HEATHER ELIZABETH WHITE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
August 31, 2020
Last Refreshed
November 25, 2023
Filing Location
Highlands County, FL
Category
Domestic Relations/Family 16-E
Practice Area
Family
Matter Type
Divorce,Separation
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Status set to DISPOSED | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Updated Event CASE MGN HRG-FC on 3/7/2022 1035 AM Judge HEATHER BEATO results HEARING COMPLETED on 3/7/2022 | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTHER'S PRELIMINARY CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING MOTHER'S PROPOSED PARENTING PLAN | |
January 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Event CASE MGN HRG-FC scheduled on 3/7/2022 at 1035 AM, MX - Judge HEATHER BEATO presiding. | |
January 18, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (3/7/22 10:35AM) | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT | |
August 24, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED DEFAULT | |
August 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK / CLERK CANNOT ISSUE DEFAULT - MAY MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED 07/07/21 (HECTOR LUIS LUGO) SUB | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY : ATTY FRANKLIN (07/19 - 23; 09/2-3; 10/28 - 29; 11/01; 11/24 -26; 12/23 - 24; 12-27 - 31) | |
June 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING : PROOF OF CERT MAILL/RETURN RECEIPT TO BOND DRUG COMPANY OF ILLINOIS C/O WALGREENS EASTERN CO INC | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ***CLERK CAN'T ISSUE DEFAULT / NO SERVICE / CAN APPLY FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT, ETC** | |
May 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO FATHER'S AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND FOR RELATED RELIEF (DOR) | |
May 04, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS SERVED 04/29/21 (FL DOR ) GOV AGENCY | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 assessed at sum $295.00 | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 3 Total Assessed $295.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 210162 | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK ($10.00 FEE) | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | COUNTER PETITION AND ANSWER TO FATHER'S AMENDED PETITION TO DETERMINE PATERNITY AND OTHER RELIEF (MOTHER) | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING : (NOTICE OF FILING SS #; UCCJEA) | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT - (UCCJEA) | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES (FC12-1063)(FC13-806)(FC16-143)(FC14-985)(FC20-628) | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERR | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDARD FAMILY LAW INTERROGATORIES FOR ORIG/ENFOR | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED BY MSE (FLDOR) | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR MANDATORY DISCLOSURE (FL FAM LRP 12.285 (MOTHER) | |
April 26, 2021 | Docket Event | EPORTAL RECEIPT | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Respondent Attorney: PATRICIA LYNCH FRANKLIN Assigned to FACC.CLERICUS.Identity.NamesBAO | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE & DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS: ATTY FRANKLIN FOR THE MOTHER | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET AMENDED | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED AMENDED | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES AMENDED | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR PATERNITY AMENDED | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER *HECTOR AMENDED | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT *HECTOR AMENDED | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING CHILD SUPPORT GUIDELINES WORKSHEET | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEVIATION FROM GUIDELINES | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (AFFIDAVIT) | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO HECTOR FOR ALEXANDRIA | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED FINAL JUDGMENT SUBMITTED (3 COPIES) | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00 | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $10.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
March 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 207001 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | **PROPOSED**PARENTING PLAN | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Judge: BUTZ , KELLY PAIGE assigned | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Case 282020DR000628FCAXMX Filed with Clerk on 8/31/2020 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $300.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Payment received. Receipt Number: MX 196328 | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | PRO SE LITIGANT | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | BUREAU OF VITAL STATISTICS INFORMATION FORM | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIMITATION OF SERVICES PROVIDED | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF RELATED CASES | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | PETITION FOR PATERNITY | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER - HECTOR | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (AFFIDAVIT) | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH |