Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
MELISSA WILLIAMS vs ANTONIO JENKINS
An Auto Negligence Case Division: Cv-B case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge DEARING, KATIE L presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 14, 2022
Last Refreshed
August 21, 2023
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE Division: CV-B
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT I- NEGLIGENCE
COUNT II - DANGEROUS INSTRUMENTALITY
COUNT Il — RESPONDEAT SUPERIOR
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is a legal document filed by Melissa Williams against Antonio Jenkins and Trans Care United LLC in the Circuit Court of the Fourth Judicial Circuit in Duval County, Florida. The complaint alleges negligence and dangerous instrument…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE (PLTFS) FOR TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: Aug 08, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - AKUMIN NORTHSIDE
Date: Jul 26, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES - DEFTS
Date: Jul 26, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANTS
Date: May 22, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS)
Date: Apr 17, 2023NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFFS)
Date: Apr 17, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANTS
Date: Mar 31, 2023REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT TRANS CARE UNITED LLCS) TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Mar 08, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF
Date: Mar 08, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -DEFENDANT
Date: Mar 08, 2023ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -DEFT
Date: Feb 21, 2023NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES
Date: Feb 21, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LISSA DAYTON FOR TRANS CARE UNITED LLC
Date: Feb 21, 2023CASE FEES PAID: 421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4296558
Date: Dec 16, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT., TRANS CARE UNITED LLC
Date: Dec 14, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE -PLTF TO DEFT., TRANS CARE UN
Date: Dec 14, 2022INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (PLTFS FIRST SET OF)
Date: Dec 14, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRANS CARE UNITED LLC
Date: Dec 14, 2022SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANTONIO JENKINS
Date: Dec 14, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: Dec 14, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: Dec 14, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL KELSEY SAALMANN FOR MELISSA WILLIAMS (PLTFS) OF RECORD TO AN ATTORNEY WITHIN THE SAME FIRM | |
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE (PLTFS) FOR TRIAL AND REQUEST FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY - AKUMIN NORTHSIDE | |
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES - DEFTS | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLAINTIFF MELISSA WILLIAMS') TO DEFENDANT TRANS CARE UNITED, LLC | |
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANT'S | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFENDANTS | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON ANTONIO JENKINS JAN 23RD, 2023 AT 10:00 A.M. (SUBSTITUTED) BY JANE DOE AS CO-RESIDENT | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFENDANT TRANS CARE UNITED LLC'S) TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF | |
March 08, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -DEFENDANT | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES -DEFT | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL LISSA DAYTON FOR TRANS CARE UNITED LLC | |
December 16, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $421.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4296558 | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF) TO DEFT., TRANS CARE UNITED LLC | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE -PLTF TO DEFT., TRANS CARE UN | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (PLTF'S FIRST SET OF) | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO TRANS CARE UNITED LLC | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO ANTONIO JENKINS | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE |