Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NETTIE J. BRYANT vs ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
An Auto Negligence Case Division: Cv-H case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge FELTEL JR, GILBERT presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 30, 2022
Last Refreshed
August 20, 2023
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE Division: CV-H
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Active
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Nettie J. Bryant and Chanel Mangum on behalf of themselves and K.S., a minor. They are suing Allstate Insurance Company for damages in excess of $30,000. The plaintiffs are residents of Jacksonville, Duval County, Flori…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Documents
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFENDANTS)
Date: Aug 17, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS (DEFTS) TO PLTFS INTERROGATORIES
Date: Aug 17, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS) TO PLTFS
Date: Aug 17, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NETTIE J. BRYANT 8/21/23 1 PM VIA ZOOM
Date: Jun 05, 2023REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLAINTIFF
Date: Feb 27, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFTS)
Date: Feb 13, 2023RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFFS)
Date: Nov 30, 2022RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS)
Date: Nov 15, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE -DEFENDANTS
Date: Nov 04, 2022REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -DEFENDANTS
Date: Nov 04, 2022NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES -NETTIE BRYANT
Date: Nov 04, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DEFT
Date: Nov 03, 2022NOTICE (DEFT) OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF PLTF
Date: Nov 03, 2022CASE FEES PAID: 411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4248466
Date: Sep 30, 2022REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT., ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY
Date: Sep 30, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: Sep 30, 2022COVER SHEET
Date: Sep 30, 2022Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFENDANT'S) | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS (DEFTS) TO PLTFS INTERROGATORIES | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS) TO PLTFS | |
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF NETTIE J. BRYANT 8/21/23 @ 1 PM VIA ZOOM | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL VIRGIL WRIGHT III FOR ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES -PLAINTIFF | |
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFTS) | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AMBER DAVIDS FOR ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (SECOND | |
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (PLTFS) UNVERIFIED/ TO DEFT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTFS) | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE -DEFENDANT'S | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS -DEFENDANT'S | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES -NETTIE BRYANT | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL VIRGIL WRIGHT III FOR ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY (AMENDED) AND DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES - DEFT | |
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE (DEFT) OF INTENT TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF PLTF | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL VIRGIL WRIGHT III FOR ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY BY AND THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT: CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER ON OCTOBER 5TH, 2022 AT 12:06 P.M. BY LAURIE BROWNING AS SUPERVISOR AUTHORIZED TO ACCEPT SERVICE | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 4248466 | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF) TO DEFT., ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY - PLTF | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY BY AND THROUGH ITS REGISTERED AGENT | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE |