Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
S2 JAX 3 LLC D/B/A STARDUST vs ALDIN LEESACA
An Eviction/Distress For Rent - Or Removal Of Tenant (Non-Monetary) Division: Cc-G case was filed by S2 Jax 3 Llc D B A Stardust, represented by Barron, James Ivy Iii, against Aldin Leesaca, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge MITCHELL, SCOTT F. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 02, 2020
Last Refreshed
February 21, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
County Civil
Category
EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY) Division: CC-G
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
January 17, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS 12/17//2020 11:30AM SERVE, ALDIN LEESACA | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $198.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3769082 | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS SENT TO DEFENDANT ALDIN LEESACA | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (NON-MONETARY) | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING ALDIN LEESACA | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ALDIN LEESACA | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET |