Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TRUST NO.1 SUNNY ACRES, GREG RITZERT TRUSTEE vs THADDEUS ANDERSON
An Eviction/Distress For Rent - Or Removal Of Tenant (Up To $15000) Division: Cc-L case was filed by Trust No.1 Sunny Acres, Greg Ritzert Trustee, against Thaddeus Anderson, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge KALIL, MICHELLE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 08, 2020
Last Refreshed
August 19, 2023
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
County Civil
Category
EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (UP TO $15000) Division: CC-L
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Landlord-Tenant
Status
Closed
Overview
Causes of Action
COUNT 1 Tenant Eviction
COUNT II * Damages
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Trust No. 1 Sunny Acres, Greg Ritzert Trustee against Thaddeus Anderson for eviction. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant has failed to pay rent for the months of May, June, July, August, September, and October 202…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION
Date: Mar 31, 2023NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN
Date: Jun 08, 2022NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL (AMENDED)
Date: Mar 23, 2022NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL
Date: Mar 08, 2022WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 02/17/2021 8:21AM
Date: Feb 18, 2021ORDER DENYING MOTION (DEFTS.) TO STAY
Date: Feb 08, 2021MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION
Date: Feb 08, 2021CASE FEES PAID: 7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3804900
Date: Feb 03, 2021WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED
Date: Feb 03, 2021NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR THADDEUS ANDERSON
Date: Oct 22, 2020DEFAULT AGAINST THADDEUS ANDERSON
Date: Oct 22, 2020MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST THADDEUS ANDERSON :PLAINTIFF
Date: Oct 22, 2020CASE FEES PAID: 208.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3732557
Date: Oct 09, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED (COUNT 1) TO THADDEUS ANDERSON
Date: Oct 08, 2020COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT
Date: Oct 08, 2020SUMMONS ISSUED (COUNT 2) TO THADDEUS ANDERSON
Date: Oct 08, 2020CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR THADDEUS ANDERSON
Date: Oct 08, 2020COVER SHEET (CIVIL)
Date: Oct 08, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION | |
June 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL (AMENDED) | |
March 08, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PROPOSED DISMISSAL | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED ON 02/17/2021 @ 8:21AM | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION (DEFTS.) TO STAY | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION (EMERGENCY) TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3804900 | |
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT - EVICTION BOOK 19559 PAGE 289-289 | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT FOR THADDEUS ANDERSON | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | DEFAULT AGAINST THADDEUS ANDERSON | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST THADDEUS ANDERSON :PLAINTIFF | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE INDIVIDUALLY ON 10-10-2020 AT 1:50 PM TO THADDEUS ANDERSON COUNT II | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT (ONE PAGE) AGAINST THADDEUS ANDERSON :PLAINTIFF | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE INDIVIDUALLY ON 10-10 AT 1:50 PM TO THADDEUS ANDERSON COUNT I | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF CLERK INDICATING MAILING OF COMP. AND SUMMONS FOR THADDEUS ANDERSON | |
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $208.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3732557 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (COUNT 1) TO THADDEUS ANDERSON | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT TO EVICT TENANT | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (UP TO $15000) | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | EVICTION/DISTRESS FOR RENT - OR REMOVAL OF TENANT (RESIDENTIAL) (UP TO $15000) | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (COUNT 2) TO THADDEUS ANDERSON | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR THADDEUS ANDERSON | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET (CIVIL) |