Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Gulf Atlantic Industries Of America Relief, Llc Aao Robert Amos And Janice Amos vs STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY
A Contract And Indebtedness Division: Cv-H case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge Roberson, Eric presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 08, 2020
Last Refreshed
October 04, 2023
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
Contract and Indebtedness Division: CV-H
Practice Area
Creditor
Matter Type
General Creditor
Status
Judgment on Appeal
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by Gulf Atlantic Industries of America Disaster Relief, LLC on behalf of Robert Amos and Janice Amos against State Farm Florida Insurance Company. The complaint alleges damages in excess of $30,000. The plaintiff is a Flor…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
DCA ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL ; 1D21-0643
Date: Nov 19, 2021NOTICE (PLTFS) OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Date: Nov 17, 2021CASE FEES PAID: 17.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3900968
Date: May 28, 2021NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS
Date: May 06, 2021CASE FEES PAID: 49.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3864092
Date: Apr 19, 2021CASE FEES PAID: 100.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3822616
Date: Mar 01, 2021ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
Date: Feb 18, 2021NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHE PROOF OF SERVICE OF LETTER
Date: Feb 18, 2021FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL
Date: Jan 14, 2021MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FOR ATTORNEYS FEES
Date: Nov 06, 2020CASE FEES PAID: 411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3731908
Date: Oct 08, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: Oct 08, 2020Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER DISMISSING APPEAL ; 1D21-0643 | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE (PLTF'S) OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $17.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3900968 | |
May 28, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORD ON APPEAL E-FILED TO DCA | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEAL INDEX - SUPPLEMENTAL; 1D21-0643 | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEAL PREP FEE BILL - SUPPLEMENTAL; 1D21-0643 | |
May 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DIRECTIONS TO CLERK | |
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER GRANTING APPELLANT'S MOTION TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON APPEAL; 1D21-0643 | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS | |
May 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ( PLAINTIFF'S ) TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION ) | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | RECORD ON APPEAL E-FILED TO DCA | |
April 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $49.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3864092 | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEAL PREP FEE BILL ; 1D21-0643 | |
April 07, 2021 | Docket Event | APPEAL INDEX ; 1D21-0643 | |
March 19, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES (DEFENDANT'S) | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL BOOK 19622 PAGE 1799-1803 | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | DCA ORDER DIRECTING APPELLANT TO PAY FILING FEE; 1D21-0643 | |
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event | DCA ACKNOWLEDGMENT RECEIPT ; 1D21-0643 | |
March 03, 2021 | Docket Event | DIRECTIONS TO CLERK | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING (PLTF'S) TRANSCRIPT OF HEARING ON DEFT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLTF'S COMPLAINT; DEFT'S VERIFIED MOTION TO STRIKE PLTF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AS A SHAM PLEADING, AND MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION PENDING PROOF OF STANDING AND DEFT'S MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER FROM DISCOVERY | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $100.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3822616 | |
March 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DISTRICT COURT BOOK 19609 PAGE 1342-1346 | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION | |
February 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ATTACHE PROOF OF SERVICE OF LETTER | |
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING AMENDED/ON FEBRUARY 17 2021 @ 10;30 AM ZOOM VIDEI. | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 22, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (PLTF) | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO (PLTFS) IN OPPOSITION TO DEFTS VERIFIED MOTION TO STRIKE PLTFS COMPLAINT AS A SHAM PLEADING | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF MARVIN M LEBOVITZ PRESIDENT GULF ATLANTIC INDUSTRIES OF AMERICA INC | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE (VERIFIED) PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT AS SHAM PLEADING AND MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION PENDING PROOF OF STANDING | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (DEFENDANT'S) -1/14/2021 @ 9:30AM AT DUVAL COUNTY COURTHOUSE 501 W ADAMS STREET, STE 7003 JAX, FL 32202 | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS (DEFENDANT'S) PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT | |
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT (PLTF) | |
December 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING OF DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFT.'S VERIFIED MOTION TO STRIKE PLTF.'S COMPLAINT AS A SHAM PLEADING | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (DEFTS) ON 01/05/2021 @1045AM VIA ZOOM | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 1-5-21 @ 10:45 AM | |
November 17, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION (DEFT'S AMENDED) TO DISMISS PLTF'S COMPLAINT VERIFIED MOTION TO STRIKE PLTF'S COMPLAINT AS A SHAM PLEADING AND MOTION TO ABATE LITIGATION PENDING PROOF OF STANDING | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
November 03, 2020 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY ; ELECTRONIC DELIVERY ON 10/13/2020 | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION (DEFT'S) TO DISMISS PLTF'S COMPLAINT VERIFIED MOTION TO STRIKE PLTF'S COMPLAINT AS A SHAM PLEADING AND TO ABATE LITIGATION PENDING PROOF OF STANDING | |
November 02, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION (DEFT'S) FOR PROTECTIVE FROM DISCOVERY | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $411.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3731908 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) DUCES TECUM DEFT'S FIELD ADJUSTER (PLTF'S) DUCES TECUM OF DEFT'S FIELD ADJUSTER 01/26/2021 @ 200PM MAGER PARUAS 2719 HOLLYWOOD BLVD, HOLLYWOOD FL 33020 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | CONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLTF'S) DUCES TECUM OF DEFT'S CORP REP. 01/26/2021 @ 1000AM MAGER PARUAS 2719 HOLLYWOOD BLVD, HOLLYWOOD FL 33020 | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) IT'S FIRST SET TO DEFT | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S FIRST) DIRECTED TO DEFT | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO STATE FARM FLORIDA INSURANCE COMPANY | |
October 08, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET |