Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
BRIAN MORGAN vs JOHNNY BENJAMIN KEENE III et al
An Auto Negligence Case Division: Cv-E case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge Anderson Jr, Bruce R presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
October 04, 2020
Last Refreshed
April 06, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE Division: CV-E
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF REQUIREMENT FOR CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION -OF BRIANNE MORGAN AND ROBERT JEANS/DEFT. LM GEN. INS. CO. | |
October 28, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT -COMPLETELY SETTLEMENT | |
October 19, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE AND AUTHORITY BY PLTF | |
October 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT) | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION ZOOM/ OF BRIANNE MORGAN AT 10AM AND ROBERT JEANS AT 10:30AM ON 10/29/21 VIA ZOOM | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE (PLTF.'S) AND/OR OBJECTION TO DEFT.'S REQUEST FOR PLTF. TO SUBMIT TO AN EXAMINATION | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR PLTF TO SUBMIT TO AN EXAMINATION 12/03/2021 @ 130PM DR. SUNDAY ERO 1453 OLD ST. AUGUSTINE RD STE 3210 | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 10/25/21 @ 900AM VIA ZOOM | |
May 06, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LAW OFFICE OF J. CHRISTOPHER NORRIS, PO BOX 7217 LONDON,KY 40742 | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (ZOOM) OF BRIAN MORGAN ON JUNE 09, 2021 AT 10:00 A.M., VIA ZOOM | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL JEFFREY SNEED FOR LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 16, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JEFFREY SNEED FOR LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
April 13, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY -DEFTS | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF COUNSEL HENRY ROMEU FOR LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS (PLTF'S) TO DEFT LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) DEFT LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S TO PLTF | |
November 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (PLTF'S) TO DEFT LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
November 23, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS) TO PLTF | |
November 11, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFT. LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY'S/ TO PLTF'S | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLTF | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL JULIE FRUSCIENTE FOR LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLTF | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER BY DEFT LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
October 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISCLOSURE | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY 10/12/2020 VIA ELECTRONIC DELIVERY BY CHIEF FINANCIAL OFFICER | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT VENITA-JEAN KIBILI | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES PLTF | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO VENITA-JEAN KIBILI | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO JOHNNY BENJAMIN KEENE III | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED TO LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) TO DEFT JOHNNY BENJAMIN KEENE III | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT VENITA-JEAN KIBILI | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S) | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
October 04, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3729552 | |
October 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL |