Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
LATANGA BRYANT vs EDWARD J. MANSON JR et al
An Auto Negligence Case Division: Cv-H case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) represented by (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge Roberson, Eric presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 29, 2020
Last Refreshed
March 30, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE Division: CV-H
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Automobile
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Attorneys for Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 13, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT, STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE | |
June 24, 2021 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE - THE CASE WAS COMPLETELY SETTLED. | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFT., STATE FARM'S) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT'S) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S FOURTH) TO PLTF | |
June 02, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES BY PLTF | |
May 27, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFT STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
May 24, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY ---DEFT'S AND ATTY | |
May 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFT.'S) /PLTF.'S/ | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES --PLTF/ AND ATTY | |
May 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE --PLTF/ AND ATTY | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE DOCUMENTS (DEFENDANT'S SUPPLEMENTAL) | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF LATANGA BRYANT (DEFENDANT'S) | |
March 26, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF ATTENDANCE | |
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO TAYLOR ANN MANSON AND EDWARD J. MANSON JR. -PLAINTIFF | |
March 16, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE FROM RECORDS CUSTODIAN-ADVANCED DIAGNOSTIC GROUP ON MARCH 4 2021 @ 03;35 PM | |
March 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S) WITH PLAINTIFF AND CO-DEFENDANT | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
March 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PLTF'S JOINT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT. | |
March 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DEFT'S/ OF CROSS-NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION TO PLTF. | |
March 09, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF (DEFTS) DEFTS REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION | |
March 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPULSORY MEDICAL EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF (CROSS-NOTICE) | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON WRITTEN QUESTIONS AND SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM | |
March 02, 2021 | Docket Event | OBJECTION TO STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. REQUEST TO SUBMIT TO AN EXAMINATION (PLTF.) | |
February 15, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFT STATE FARMS) WITH PLTF & CO-DEFTS REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLTF'S) | |
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT (PLTF'S) JOINT | |
February 01, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY BY DEFT | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S) TO PLAINTIFF'S | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S) TO CO-DEFENDANT'S | |
January 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFENDANT’S) | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFTS) TO DEFT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
January 08, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (PLTF AMENDED) OF DEFT TAYLOR ANN MANSON 01/11/2021 @130PM | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE ON 06/23/2021 @130PM AT NORTH FLORIDA MEDIATION CENTER | |
December 21, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES PLTF'S | |
December 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION (DEFT'S) PHYSICAL | |
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT JOINT/ - DEFTS | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY PLTF | |
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
December 08, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFT STATE FARM'S) WITH PLTFS/ | |
December 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION 1-11-21 @ 1:30PM | |
November 25, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION (CROSS-NOTICE) 1-11-21 @ 10 AM | |
November 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION 1-11-20 @ 10 AM | |
November 06, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFT STATE FARM'S) WITH PLTF'S | |
November 04, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFT STATE FARM AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
October 29, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFENDANT'S) | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLTF LATANGA BRYANT | |
October 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE --TO PLTF | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT'S) STATE FARM MUTUAL | |
October 14, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT'S THIRD) TO PLTF STATE FARM MUTUAL | |
October 06, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
September 22, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES -DEFT'S/ REGARDING CO-DEFENDANT'S | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE BY PLTF LATANGA BRYANT | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT (DEFENDANT'S) | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS) AND OBJECTIONS TO PLTFS FIRST/ OF DOCS | |
August 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS) UNVERIFIED/ TO PLTFS FIRST/ TO DEFT | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE DEFT'S/ TO PLTF | |
August 19, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES DEFT'S | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY (DEFT) | |
August 17, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFT SECOND) TO PLTF | |
July 31, 2020 | Docket Event | REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES PLTF/ AND ATTY | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES (DEFTS) | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (DEFTS) OF DOCS | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (DEFTS) | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL ZACHARY ALDRICH FOR STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY | |
July 27, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANYS) | |
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event | ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES (DEFT'S) | |
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL HEATHER MCGRIFF FOR TAYLOR MANSON AND EDWARD MANSON JR AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
May 04, 2020 | Docket Event | DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., TAYLOR ANN MANSON | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF.'S) TO DEFT., EDWARD J MANSON JR. | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF.'S) TO DEFT., TAYLOR ANN MANSON | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE (PLTF'S FIRST) TO DEFT., STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - EDWARD MANSON JR. | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - TAYLOR ANN MANSON | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS (PLTF.'S) | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS. CO. | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | AUTO NEGLIGENCE CASE | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT., EDWARD J MANSON JR. | |
April 30, 2020 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED - STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INS.CO. | |
April 29, 2020 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $431.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 3659628 |