Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs JACQUELINE L HEARNE
A Homestead Residential Foreclosure - $0 - $50,000 Division: Fc-G case was filed by Pnc Bank, National Association, represented by Furlong, Christopher Sean, against Jacqueline L Hearne, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 06, 2011
Last Refreshed
February 22, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Judge
Hon. FORECLOSURE JUDGE,
Category
Homestead Residential Foreclosure - $0 - $50,000 Division: FC-G
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER DISBURSE $653.98 TO: PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION C/O LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL C. CONSUEGRA 9204 KING PALM DRIVE TAMPA, FL 33619-1328 | |
August 06, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS AND INTEREST AFTER FINAL JUDGMENT | |
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER DISBURSE $47,414.70 TO: PNC BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION C/O LAW OFFICES OF DANIEL C. CONSUEGRA 9204 KING PALM DRIVE TAMPA, FL 33619-1328 | |
July 26, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
July 16, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO CORNER LOT PROPERTIES, LLC OR BK 16454 PG 1831 | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $46,494.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1870380 | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER A DEP. OF ($ 2,405.00) WAS TAKEN FROM BIDDER # 13159'S ACCT. 3 CHECKS, ($ 45,695.00 REM. BAL., $ 729.00 CLERK'S FEE, $ 70.00 SALES FEE) WAS SUBMITTED. | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CANCEL AND RESCHEDULE SALE | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | PER JA (SUZI) - MOTION TO CANCEL IS DENIED - SALE IS NOT CANCELLED - ORDER TO FOLLOW*** | |
June 27, 2013 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE ISSUED TO CORNER LOT PROPERTIES, LLC BIDDER#13159 AMT $48,100.00 BOOK 16430 PAGE 2493-2494 | |
June 26, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE AND RESCHEDULE | |
May 30, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 06/27/2013 11AM | |
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM : DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE - SD 06/27/13 BOOK 16388 PAGE 768-772 | |
April 15, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING -5-14-2013@10:00AM ROOM 604 | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES (REASONABLE) | |
February 28, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
February 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTORNEYS FEES | |
January 25, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE;ORIGINAL MORTGAGE | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNK. SPOUSE OF JACUQUELINE L. HEARNE, UNK. TENANT1, TENANT 2 | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT JACQUELINE L. HEARNE | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
November 02, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
October 29, 2012 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JACQUELINE HEARNE | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACQUELINE HEARNE, UNKNOWN TENANT #1, AND UNKNOWN TENANT #2 | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEYS FEES | |
September 07, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DESIGNATING PRIMARY EMAIL ADDRESS FOR THE SERVICE OF PLEADINGS AND PAPERS | |
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM -THE RMFM PROGRAM HAS BEEN UNABLE TO CONTACT BORROWER, JACQUELINE HEARNE | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON JACQUELINE L. HEARNE 12/17/11 | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #2 | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT #1 | |
December 30, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACQUELINE L. HEARNE | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL SALE/EL/SUCCBID 70.00 IMPOSED | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 15998 PAGE 342-344 | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | JUDICIAL SALE/EL/PLAINT 70.00 IMPOSED | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ISSUED 4 | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #1 | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE MEDIATION FORM A (COPY OF CHECK) | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED JACQUELINE L. HEARNE | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN TENANT #2 | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | HOMESTEAD RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE - $0 - $50,000 | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JACQUELINE L. HEARNE | |
December 06, 2011 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $581.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1448421 |