Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
HSBC BANK., vs BERNEITHER CLAYTON et al
A Foreclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-C case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge TAYLOR, L. HALDANE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
November 16, 2008
Last Refreshed
December 18, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Judge
Hon. TAYLOR, L. HALDANE
Category
FORECLOSURE (use on cases prior to 2010) Division: CV-C
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 14858 PAGE 1666-1667 | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNK PARTIES IN POSS #1 | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE BRUCE LAVANT 12192008 | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNK PARTIES IN POSS #2 | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE BERNEITHER CLAYTON 12192008 | |
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | RESPONSE BRUCE & BERNEITHER LAVANT | |
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED 4 | |
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE | |
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $341.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 538356 | |
December 16, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
November 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14728 PAGE 775-776 |