Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
FLAGSTAR BANK, F.S.B. vs LOUANN HAMMAN et al
A Foreclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-G case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge DAY, LANCE M. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 04, 2008
Last Refreshed
December 09, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
FORECLOSURE (use on cases prior to 2010) Division: CV-G
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO FLAGSTAR BANK, F.S.B. BK 15070 PG 2311 | |
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMT: $100.00 BOOK 15052 PAGE 23-24 | |
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $140.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 834744 | |
October 29, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 10/29/2009 11:00 AM | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTY'S FEES | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM (JUDGE) | |
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY : UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATEW HAMMAN, UNK. TENANTS # 1 AND # 2 | |
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE BOOK 15012 PAGE 1249-1252 | |
July 30, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING : ORIGINAL MORTGAGE AND NOTE | |
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 07302009, 10 AM., ROOM 227 | |
July 02, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FLAGSTAR BANK , F.S.B. | |
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFF. INDEBT.COPY OF UNRECORDED ASSIGNM. MORTG. | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS COPY | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFDVT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS; COPY OF UNRECORDED ASSGNMT OF MORTGAGE ETC -COPY | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 05182009, 10 AM., ROOM 227 | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING RE-NTC MOTION CALENDAR 05182009 AT 10AM -COPY | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 03232009, 10 AM., ROOM 227 | |
March 12, 2009 | Docket Event | UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT MARHEW HAMMAN- ANSWER 1-16-09 | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S TIME EFFORT AND COSTS | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 03/23/2009 @ 10AM ROOM 227 | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FINAL) OF FORECLOSURE AND RE ESTABLISH A LOST INSTRUMENT | |
March 05, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF TIME, EFFORT AND COSTS | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT SUMMARY, OF FORECLOSURE ETC (COPY) | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING MOTION CALENDAR (03232009 AT 10AM) COPY | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT AND COSTS (COPY) | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
March 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFDVT OF TIME, EFFORT AND COSTS (COPY) | |
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER DEFTS LOUANN HAMMAN, WILLIAM HAMMAN AND MATTHEW HAMMAN/ATTY | |
January 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARENCE OF COUNSEL | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED NON-SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT II | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED NON-SERVED ON UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MATHEW HAMMAN | |
December 23, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED NON-SERVED ON UNKNOWN TENANT I | |
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE WILLIAM HAMMAN 12/13/08 | |
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE LOUANN HAMMAN 12/13/08 | |
December 22, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE MATTHEW HAMMAN 12/13/08 | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $363.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 527858 | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS($10/EA) 10.00 IMPOSED | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14718 PAGE 208-208 | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED 6 | |
December 04, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE |