Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY vs ANGEL COLGAN et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge FORECLOSURE JUDGE, presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 01, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Judge
Hon. FORECLOSURE JUDGE,
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1026252 | |
June 08, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY BK 15269 PG 155 | |
May 26, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1016620 | |
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMT $100.00 BOOK 15255 PAGE 380-381 | |
May 25, 2010 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
April 21, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 05/25/2010 11:00 A.M. | |
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT 2 RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF LOST NOTE | |
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE BOOK 15218 PAGE 2402-2408 | |
April 15, 2010 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE | |
April 08, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT (PLAINTIFF'S) | |
March 18, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 04152010, 930 AM., ROOM 204 | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING NON MILITARY AFF. | |
March 05, 2010 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT LARRY COLGAN, ET. AL. | |
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMTS DUE & OWING | |
February 19, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO REASONABLE ATTY FEES | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | DEFAULT LARRY COLGAN, ANGEL COLGAN, MERS, INC., AND ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
January 14, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING | |
January 13, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIG NOTE | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING HRG TO TAX ATTY FEES | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF DEFT UNK. SPS. OF LARRY COLGAN, TENANT 1-4 | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED ANGEL COLGAN; ANY AND ALL UNK. PARTIES ETC. | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $10.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 630026 | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT DILIGENT SEARCH | |
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO ANGEL COLGAN | |
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF LOST ORIG FOR ANGEL COLGAN | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO TNT NO 2 | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO MORTGAGE ELECT REG SYSTEMS | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO LARRY COLGAN | |
February 18, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO THE UNK SPS OF LARRY COLGAN | |
January 09, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER /RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT/PETITION/LARRY COLGAN | |
December 02, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS($10/EA) 10.00 IMPOSED | |
December 02, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $383.50 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 524120 | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED 7 | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14717 PAGE 553-553 | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
December 01, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE |