Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION vs JOHN CASWELL et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge DAY, LANCE M. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 30, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 24, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED MAJOR SANDERS ET. AL., 03232009 | |
March 13, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (SENT TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE W/ CK # 22898) | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | UNABLE TO ISSUE TITLE NEED PROOF OF PUB. | |
December 05, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
November 12, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 505555 | |
November 10, 2008 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMOUNT: $ 1,100.00 BOOK 14787 PAGE 1837-1838 | |
October 09, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 11/10/2008 11:00 L1 B9 CAMPBELLS | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT FN SALE 11/10/08 @ 11:00 AM BOOK 14664 PAGE 2315-2319 | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE, MTG | |
October 06, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT MAJOR SANDERS JR; JOHN CASWELL; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF MAJOR SANDERS; JOHN DOE AKA JOHNNIE HAMILTON; JANE DOE AKA ANDREA HAMILTON | |
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS COPY | |
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES COPY | |
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FINAL, OF FORECLOSURE - COPY | |
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 10062008 AT 10AM -COPY | |
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS COPY | |
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIG.RECORDED ASSIGMENT MORTGAGE, FEDEX | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS FEDEX | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES FEDEX | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS FEDEX | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FINAL FORECLOSURE., FEDEX | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT, FEDEX | |
September 15, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 10062008, 10 AM., ROOM 227, FEDEX | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE , JOHNNIE HAMILTON AS JOHN DOE | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE , MAJOR SANDERS | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE JOHN CASWELL | |
August 25, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE , ANDREA HAMILTON AS JANE DOE | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14561 PAGE 865-865 | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED (5) | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $256.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 370878 | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE |