Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, ETC., vs AMERICAN SUZUKI AUTOMOTIVE CREDIT, INC et al
A Foreclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-B case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge TYGART, FREDERICK B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
June 16, 2008
Last Refreshed
December 17, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
FORECLOSURE (use on cases prior to 2010) Division: CV-B
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (AMENDED) SUMMONS SERVED CLESHAWN JOYCE 06182008 | |
January 12, 2009 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUMMONS (AMENDED) CAMILLA JOYCE SUMMONS SERVED 06182008 | |
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE BOOK 14720 PAGE 752-753 | |
December 08, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER RETURNED NOT SERVED | |
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER RETURNED SERVED ON CAMILLA JOYCE 6/18/08 | |
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER RETURNED SERVED 6/24/08 ON BONNIE MATLOCK | |
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER RETURNED SERVED ON CLESHAWN JOYCE 6/18/08 | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | LETTER CAMILLA JOYCE 07/01/2008 | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | LETTER CLESHAWN JOYCE 06/23/2008 | |
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $268.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 356185 | |
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED 7 | |
June 17, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14546 PAGE 670-670 | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE |