Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KONDUR CAPITAL CORP. vs TIMA MUSTAFIC
A Foreclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-C case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge TAYLOR, L. HALDANE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 30, 2008
Last Refreshed
December 24, 2023
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Judge
Hon. TAYLOR, L. HALDANE
Category
FORECLOSURE (use on cases prior to 2010) Division: CV-C
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
CASE FEES PAID: 50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 892872
Date: Jan 11, 2010NOTICE OF SALE 12/01/2009 11:00 AM
Date: Nov 06, 2009FINAL DISPOSITION FORM
Date: Oct 28, 2009DEFAULT TIMA MUSTAFIC;ADIR MISTAFIC;MERSINC
Date: Sep 18, 2009MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: Sep 10, 2009NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 09112009, 920AM.,
Date: Sep 01, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TIMA MUSTAFIC, 05182009
Date: Jun 02, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ADMIR MUSTAFIC, 05182009
Date: Jun 02, 2009CASE FEES PAID: 40.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 686207
Date: May 11, 2009SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE MERS INC 05/12/2008 UPS
Date: May 20, 2008NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14487 PAGE 1100-1101
Date: May 01, 2008Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2010 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 892872 | |
January 04, 2010 | Docket Event | MOTION EXPARTE TO VACATE FINAL JUDGMENT, DISMISS ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISSOLVE LIS PENDENS AND RELEASE ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER VACATING FINAL JUDGMENT, DISMISSING ACTION WITHOUT PREJUDICE, DISSOLVING LIS PENDENS AND RELEASING ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS BOOK 15115 PAGE 1329-1330 | |
November 06, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 12/01/2009 11:00 AM | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING LOST NOTE AFFIDAVIT WITH ATTACHED EXHIBIT A | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT IN MORTAGE FORECLOSURE AND RE-ESTABLISHING LOST NOTE BOOK 15060 PAGE 1094-1099 | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT TIMA MUSTAFIC;ADIR MISTAFIC;MERSINC | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNK SPS OF TIMA MUSTAFIC AND ADIMAR MUSTAFIC, UNK TENANT I & II W/O PREJ | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIG PREPAYMENT NOTE ADDENDUM, ADDENDUM TO NOTE ETC | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING LOST NOTE AFFIDAVIT | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | LOST NOTE AFFIDAVIT | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING , 10/28/09 @ 9:20AM RM 210 | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING COPY OF ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGES | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT (SUMMARY) IN MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE AND RE-ESTABLISHING LOST NOTE | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS | |
September 10, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF TIME AND EFFORT | |
September 09, 2009 | Docket Event | ANSWER & NOTICE OF APPEARANCE/GREENLAND CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC/MICHAEL GOLDSBERRY ESQ | |
September 04, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD COUNT TO RE-ESTABLISH LOST LOAN DOCUMENTS | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE & RE-ESTABLISH LOAN DOCUMENTS/PLTF/ATTY | |
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ADD COUNT TO RE-ESTABLISH LOST LOAN DOCUMENTS/PLTF/ATTY | |
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 09112009, 920AM., | |
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLTF. BOOK 14987 PAGE 212-213 | |
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | AMENDED ANSWER AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF PARTY PLTF/PLTF/ATTY | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TIMA MUSTAFIC, 05182009 | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF TIMA MUSTAFIC | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ADMIR MUSTAFIC, 05182009 | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DAMIR MUSTAFIC | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $40.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 686207 | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ALIAS- UNK SPOUSE OF ADMIR MUSTAFIC | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ALIAS-ADMIR MUSTAFIC | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ALIAS-TIMA MUSTAFIC | |
May 11, 2009 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED ALIAS-UNK SPOUSE OF TIMA MUSTAFIC | |
March 02, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY PLTF BOOK 14798 PAGE 1389-1390 | |
February 25, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION EX PARTE, FOR SUBST. OF PARTY PLTF. | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND ANSWER/GREENLAND CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOC INC/ATTY | |
January 08, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR SUBST. OF COUNSEL | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION & ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | CONSENT [COPY] TO SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
January 06, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL | |
May 20, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE MERS INC 05/12/2008 UPS | |
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO UNK TNT II | |
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO ADIR MUSTAFIC | |
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO TIMA MUSTAFIC | |
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO UNK SPS OF TIMA MUSTAFIC | |
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO UNK SPS OF ADIR MUSTAFIC | |
May 16, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO UNK TNT NO 1 | |
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 5/6/08 GREENLAND CHASE HOMEOWNERS ASSOC ETC (132475) | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14487 PAGE 1100-1101 | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $262.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 312886 | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED (8) | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE |