Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
NORTH CREEK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC vs BRENDA B SAMUELS et al
A Civil Complaint - Not Otherwise Coded (Use On Cases Prior To 2010). Division: Cv-E case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge NACHMAN, BERNARD presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 30, 2008
Last Refreshed
December 09, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
CIVIL COMPLAINT - NOT OTHERWISE CODED (use on cases prior to 2010). Division: CV-E
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2020 | Docket Event | VERIFIED AND IMAGED & REDACTED | |
October 19, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING HEARING FOR 10/06/2011 2:00 PM | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION | |
March 15, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ETC., 03312010, 11 AM., ROOM 224 | |
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ROBERTO R. SAMUELS;BRENDA B. SAMUELS;HSBC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC. | |
March 20, 2009 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT - ROBERTO R & BRENDA B SAMUELS | |
March 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND AWARD OF ATTY'S FEE AND COSTS | |
March 09, 2009 | Docket Event | COPY OF BKC ORDER DISMISSING CHAPTER 13 CASE | |
May 30, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE HSBC MTG SERV INC 051408 | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ROBERTO R SAMUELS, 050208 | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE BRENDA SAMUELS, 050208 | |
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event | CIVIL COMPLAINT - NOT OTHERWISE CODED | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $256.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 312837 | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED (3) | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BOOK 14487 PAGE 1273-1274 | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET |