Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
DEUTSCHE BANK TRUST COMPANY AMERICAS vs CHRIS L. COIMBRA
A Foreclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-E case was filed by Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas, represented by Sawyer, Jonathan David, against Chris L. Coimbra, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge NACHMAN, BERNARD presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 24, 2008
Last Refreshed
December 09, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
FORECLOSURE (use on cases prior to 2010) Division: CV-E
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY BK 15070 PG 2300 | |
November 16, 2009 | Docket Event | ASSIGNMENT OF BID ISSUED TO DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY BOOK 15068 PAGE 565-566 | |
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $140.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 835390 | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID $100.00 BOOK 15050 PAGE 2026-2027 | |
October 28, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 798985 | |
September 18, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 10/28/2009 11:00 AM | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION (COPY) TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO RESCHEDULE FORECLOSURE SALE | |
September 17, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER RESCHEDULING FORECLSOURE SALE BOOK 15011 PAGE 2281-2282 | |
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING EXECUTED AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING, GOOD THROUGH 4-14-2009 | |
May 15, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING | |
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 05/20/2009 11:00 AM LOT 11, SEARING'S REPLAT OF BLOCK 95, SPRINGFIELD, ACCORDING TO THE PLAT THEREOF, AS RECORDED IN PLAT BOOK 6, PAGE 60, OF THE CURRENT PUBLIC RECORDS OF DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA. A/K/A 238 EAST 2ND STREET, JACKSONVILLE, F | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (SUMMARY) OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE BOOK 14849 PAGE 15-19 | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
April 14, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AS TO COUNT II | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING UNEXECUTED AFFDVT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING, ETC | |
March 26, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 04142009 AT 9PM | |
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT TIMMIE BRACKET NEED SERVICE | |
March 25, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT CHRIS L. COIMBRA;ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES ETC. | |
March 23, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event | UNABLE TO ISSUE DEFAULT NEED PROOF OF PUBLICATION FILED | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING FED EX | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ETC/PLTF/ATTY FED EX | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIG NOTE FED EX | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION FED EX | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL AS TO ATTYS FEES & COSTS FED EX | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES (REASONABLE) FED EX | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION FED EX | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
July 01, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED CHRIS COIMBRA; ANY AND ALL UNK. PARTIES ETC. | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS BY PUBLICATION | |
June 30, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT DILIGENT SEARCH | |
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TENANT # 2 | |
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TIMMIE BRACKETT | |
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TENANT # 1 | |
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED CHRIS L. COIMBRA | |
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHRIS L. COIMBRA | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED (5) | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE | |
April 24, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $262.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 306318 |