Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
EVERBANK vs HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORP. III et al
A Foreclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge FRYEFIELD, PETER J presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 11, 2008
Last Refreshed
December 08, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Judge
Hon. FRYEFIELD, PETER J
Category
FORECLOSURE (use on cases prior to 2010) Division: CV-A
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event | DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA | |
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER $2,454.46 TO: ALBERTELLI LAW , P.O. BOX 23028, TAMPA, FL.33623/BALANCE: $2,184.66/AUG 18, 09, CK #16826/ | |
August 11, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF FORECLOSURE DISBURESEMENT $2,454.46 TO: ALBERTELLI LAW , P.O. BOX 23028, TAMPA, FL.33623 BALANCE: $2184.66 | |
August 10, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING , 9/9/09 @ 10:40AM RM 224 | |
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO DISBURSE FUNDS BOOK 14968 PAGE 1380-1381 | |
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ORDER CLRK TO DISBURSE FUNDS | |
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF PLTF'S COUNSEL AS TO POST JDGMT COSTS | |
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER $48,660,88, CK#16661 | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFF COUNSEL AS TO POST JUDGM. COSTS | |
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF COUNSEL AS TO POST JUDGM.COSTS | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED SERVED | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER $48,660.88 TO: ALBERTELLI LAW/BALANCE: $4,451.12 | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO: JAX BARGAIN CARPET, INC. OR BK 14877 PG 2094 (1) | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED PLACED IN THE HANDS OF THE PURCHASER | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | MEMORANDUM TO CASHIER A DEPOSIT OF $2,665.00 WAS TAKEN FROM REAL AUCTION BIDDER ACCOUNT #5073)CK#1601154747 AMNT:$807.00 (CLERK'S FEES) CK#1601154746 AMNT:$50,635.00 (REMAINING BALANCE OF SALE) | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE ISSUED TO: JAX BARGAIN CARPET BIDDER#5073 BID AMNT $53300.00 BOOK 14862 PAGE 643-644 | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $130.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 680153 | |
May 04, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $51,442.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 679970 | |
April 03, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 05/04/2009 11:00AM LOT 2, JULINGTON FOREST, UNIT 6, ACCORDING TO PLAT THEREOF AS RECORDED IN PLAT BOOK 40, PAGES 27, 27A, 27B, OF THE CPR'S OF DUVAL COUNTY, FLORIDA (AKA) 5174 SANDRIDGE COURT, JAX FL 32258 | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT (SUMMARY) OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE BOOK 14861 PAGE 491-496 | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINALS, NOTE & MORTGAGE | |
March 31, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL (VOLUNTARY) AS TO COUNT II, RE-ESTABLISHMENT OF LOST NOTE | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFF. AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING GOOD THROUGH | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE & OWING | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 03312009, 930 AM., ROOM 224 | |
January 26, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING 02032009, 930 AM., ROOM 224 | |
January 22, 2009 | Docket Event | DEFAULT LISA M LYON; HOUSEHOLD FINANCE CORPORATION III; MERS INC. | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING UNEXECUTED AFFIDAVIT AS TO AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING,ETC | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING RM 224 02032009 9:30AM | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
January 15, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT INCLUDING A HEARING,ETC | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 4/16/08 MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REG SYS INC | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TENANT 1 | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 4/17/08 UNITED STATES OF AMERICA; 131844 | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 5/14/08 LISA LYON | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF LOST SUMMONS TENANT 2 | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LEE C. LYON | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 4/24/08 HOUSEHOLD FINANCE III | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LISA LYON | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED (DUPLICATE) TENANT 2 | |
May 29, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 4/24/08 LEE C. LYON; 131909 | |
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event | LETTER LEE CHARLES LYON | |
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER | |
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER DEFT UNITED STATES OF AMERICA FOR IRS/LACY HARWELL JR ATTY | |
April 26, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER )FWD TO THE JUDGE) | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $270.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 294338 | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED (9) | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS BK 14460 PAGE 2312 | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE |