Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
KENNETH PERGOLA, AS PERSONAL REP. OF THE ESTATE OF CHARLES KENNETH PERGOLA, SR. vs HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA
A Professional Malpractice (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-F case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge MITCHELL JR., CHARLES O. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 11, 2008
Last Refreshed
December 07, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
PROFESSIONAL MALPRACTICE (use on cases prior to 2010) Division: CV-F
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
Malpractice
Status
Dismissal
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Other Parties
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
August 16, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
December 15, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER RE-SCHEDULING CASE FOR TRIAL (JURY) WK OF 8/23/10- P.T. 8/12/10 @ 11:30AM | |
November 10, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL KENNETH PERGOLA, ETC. | |
October 30, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER ON AGREED MT TO CONTINUE TRIAL | |
October 26, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE (AGREED) TRIAL | |
October 21, 2009 | Docket Event | OUTCOME OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE IMPASSE WAS DECLARED | |
July 29, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FOR HINSHAW & CULBERTSON, LLP | |
May 29, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED ON BRANDON A. SMITH, RN | |
May 19, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS BRANDON A. SMITH, RN., 06082009, 1 PM. | |
May 13, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL WK OF 2/1/10 AT 9:00A--P/T 1/21/10 AT 10:30A, RM. 206 | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED UPON ST. VINCENT'S MEDICAL CENTER | |
May 08, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED 05/05/09 @ 1:00 P.M. | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL AND NOTICE OF HEARING AMD., 05112009, 930 AM. | |
March 14, 2009 | Docket Event | SUBPOENA RETURNED SERVED KAREN L DANIELSEN HEAVNER, ARNP 02252009 | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF LOST SUBPOENA KAREN L DANIELSEN HEAVNER, ARN | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS NORMA C. DOUGHMAN, R.N., 05122009, 10 AM. | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS KAREN L. DANIELSEN HEAVNER, ARNP, 05122009, 11 AM. | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITIONS AMD., NORMA C. DOUGHMAN, T.N., 05122009, 10 AM. | |
February 23, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL AND NOTICE OF HEARING 04152009, 930 AM. | |
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION (DEFT'S) FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AS TO CERTAIN DISCOVERY REQUEST | |
October 31, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION (DEFT'S) FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER ,ETC. (FBJ 10/30/08) | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE AMD. 1ST. | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES | |
October 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL (PLAINTIFF'S) ADEQUATE DISCOVERY REQUEST | |
October 17, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 24 (PLAINTIFF'S), 10-3-08, 10:50 AM, RM 208, JUDGE MITCHELL | |
July 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES | |
July 16, 2008 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event | OBJECTION REQUEST PRODUCTION, HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORP.OF AMERICA | |
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event | OBJECTION INITIAL INTERR., HEALTH CARE AND RETIREMENT CORPORATION OF AMERICA | |
June 27, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES (1ST SET); ATTY/DEF | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE ATTY/DEF | |
June 16, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY CHARLES DAY M.D., J.D. CURY M.D., ETAL; ATTY/DEF | |
May 15, 2008 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES PLTF/ATTY | |
May 02, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, & DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL /DEFTS/H KEITH THOMERSON ATTY | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE INITIAL, TO DEFT. | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | PROFESSIONAL MALPRACTICE | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR JURY TRIAL | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFT. | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $256.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 293405 |