Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANCE, INC. vs CHARLES W. FINNEY
A Foreclosure (Use On Cases Prior To 2010) Division: Cv-B case was filed by Vanderbilt Mortgage And Finance, Inc., represented by Cohen, Lance Paul, against Charles W. Finney, in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge TYGART, FREDERICK B. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 11, 2008
Last Refreshed
December 21, 2022
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Filing Court House
Circuit Civil
Category
FORECLOSURE (use on cases prior to 2010) Division: CV-B
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
November 18, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO : VANDERBILT MORTGAGE AND FINANCE, INC. OR BK 14702 PG 1763-1 | |
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $70.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 484147 | |
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID $100.00 BOOK 14674 PAGE 1675-1676 | |
October 16, 2008 | Docket Event | ANSWER DEFT STATE OF FLORIDA/ATTY | |
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 10/20/2008 11:00 L11 WILDERNESS GARDENS | |
September 19, 2008 | Docket Event | COPY MAILED NOS | |
September 18, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE BOOK 14643 PAGE 1249-1253 | |
July 30, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING SEPT 18 2008 9AM TYGART | |
July 16, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT STATE OF FLORIDA | |
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (FINAL) | |
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM | |
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
July 10, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT /ATTY LANCE COHEN FOR PLT. | |
May 27, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS BY DEFENDANT ATTY/DEF | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ON KATHLEEM FAIRCLOTH | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION OF NT OF ACTN | |
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ACTION - ISSUED CHARLES FINNEY;CHRISTINE FINNEY | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT PURSUANT 49.041 FLA. STAT | |
April 15, 2008 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF MAILING | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ISSUED (1) | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS OR BK 14459 PG 40 (1) | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 11, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $256.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 293333 |