Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
WACHOVIA BANK N.A. vs ELMER E O'DELL SR et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge MITCHELL JR., CHARLES O. presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 22, 2005
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Status
Closed
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2014 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE WRIT OF EXECUTION SERVED 05/23/2014 | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $7.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 1569353 | |
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT BOOK 14657 PAGE 548-551 | |
September 16, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT BY JUDGE | |
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 09162008, 1015 AM., ROOM 208 | |
September 05, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
July 15, 2008 | Docket Event | ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR TRANSFER OF A CIVIL ACTION & MT TO ABATE FOR IMPROPER VENUE | |
June 23, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION TO ABATE FOR IMPROPER VENUE, O'DELL GROVES, INC. | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON DEF MOTION 070908 215PM RM208 | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION TO TRANSFER OR CHANGE VENUE | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS | |
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ROBERT J. O'DELL | |
April 22, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE WILLIAM E. O'DELL 04/11/08 | |
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 4/10/08 ROSELLA O'DELL | |
April 16, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE 4/10/08 ELMER O'DELL SR | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | CIVIL COMPLAINT - NOT OTHERWISE CODED | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, SUMMONS ISSUED (5) | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | RECEIPT NUMBER 285968 REVISED | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $256.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 285968 | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 22, 2005 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE ROBERT J. O'DELL 04/12/08 |