Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORPORATION vs ALVIN A. BLOUNT II et al
A case was filed by (Subcribe to view) represented by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Duval County, FL. Judge TAYLOR, L. HALDANE presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
April 03, 2008
Last Refreshed
February 20, 2021
Filing Location
Duval County, FL
Judge
Hon. TAYLOR, L. HALDANE
Status
Judgment of Foreclosure
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED NOT SERVED ALVIN A. BLOUNT II, ET. AL., | |
August 05, 2009 | Docket Event | WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED SENT TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE W/CK#81856 | |
July 13, 2009 | Docket Event | UNABLE TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION: NEED $90.00 CHECK TO SHERIFF'S OFFICE | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $50.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 730918 | |
July 01, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER DIRECTING DUVAL CLERK TO ISSUE WRIT OF POSSESSION BOOK 14937 PAGE 70-71 | |
June 30, 2009 | Docket Event | MOTION EXPARTE TO FOR ORDER DIRECTING CLERK TO ISSUE A WRIT OF POSSESSION | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS | |
May 20, 2009 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORPORATION BK 14881 PG 716 | |
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $130.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 676026 | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | THIRD PARTY BID SHEET | |
April 28, 2009 | Docket Event | CONDUCT SALE-FEE PD-BID BY PLTF-CERTIFICATE OF SALE AND PROOF BID AMNT 27100.00 BOOK 14856 PAGE 702-703 | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SALE 04/28/2009 11AM L25, COBBLESTONE FOREST UNIT TWO | |
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 24, 2009 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE BOOK 14806 PAGE 2416-2420 | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING (RE-NOTICE) 02/24/2009 9:30AM RM 210 FED EX | |
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIG RECORDED ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE FED EX | |
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event | DEFAULT ALVIN A BLOUNT II; ELLA M FLOYD- BLOUNT | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO INDEBTEDNESS FED EX | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING ORIGINAL NOTE AND COPY OF THE RECORDED ASSIGNMENT OF MORTGAGE | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY JOHN DOE;JANE DOE | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY'S FEES FED EX | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF TIME & EFFORT FED EX | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE/PLTF/ATTY FED EX | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING 09/02/2008 9:20AM RM 210 FED EX | |
August 12, 2008 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT AS TO COSTS FED EX | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO JOHN DOE | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO ELLA M FLOYD-BLOUNT 04052008-129543 | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED INDICATING SERVICE TO ALVIN A BLOUNT II 04052008-129544 | |
May 01, 2008 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED TO JANE DOE | |
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS OR 14447 PG 741 (1) | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS, SUMMONS ISSUED (4) | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | FORECLOSURE | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | COVER SHEET | |
April 03, 2008 | Docket Event | CASE FEES PAID: $256.00 ON RECEIPT NUMBER 285643 |