Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Ramirez, Hilarion A Vs Ramirez, Carmen
On July 16, 2009 a non-homestead foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 case was filed by (Subcribe to view) against (Subscribe to view) in the jurisdiction of Collier County, FL. Judge Brodie, Lauren L presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
July 16, 2009
Last Refreshed
September 07, 2023
Filing Location
Collier County, FL
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Cynthia A Pivacek;Category
Non-Homestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999
Practice Area
Property
Matter Type
Foreclosure
Status
Dismissal
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Case Complaint Summary
This complaint is filed by TAYLOR, BEAN & WHITAKER MORTGAGE CORPORATION against the defendants HILARION A. RAMIREZ, CARMEN RAMIREZ, JERONIMO SANCHEZ-BAUTISTA, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JERONIMO SANCHEZ-BAUTISTA, and UNKNOWN TENANT(S) in the Circuit Court…...
Parties
Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
Final Disposition Form
Date: Apr 25, 2013Cover Letter
Date: Oct 26, 2012Order Granting Substitution of Party Plaintiff
Date: Oct 26, 2012Motion for Substitution of Party Plaintiff
Date: Oct 25, 2012Designation of E-Mail Address
Date: Sep 21, 2012Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Cynthia A Pivacek
Date: Jun 30, 2012Default issued by clerk on Unknown Tenant,
Date: Nov 03, 2011Non-Military Affidavit
Date: Oct 26, 2011Motion for Default on Unknown Tenant,
Date: Oct 26, 2011Notice of Dropping Party Unknown Spouse,
Date: Oct 20, 2011Order Approving Stipulation For Substitution Of Counsel
Date: Aug 10, 2011Correspondence From Counsel To Judge
Date: Aug 08, 2011Consent To Stipulation Of Counsel
Date: Aug 08, 2011Stipulation For Substitution Of Counsel
Date: Aug 08, 2011Order Granting Motion For Substitution Of Party Plaintiff
Date: Jul 07, 2011Correspondence From Counsel To Judge
Date: Jul 07, 2011Motion For Substitution Of Party Plaintiff
Date: Jul 07, 2011Notice Of Filing Demand Letter
Date: Jun 02, 2011Notice Of Filing
Date: Jun 02, 2011Bond 100.00 Surety (No Approval Fee Paid)
Date: Jun 02, 2011Order Continuing Case For 60 Days
Date: Jun 02, 2011Response To Defendants Request For Verification Of Debt
Date: Jun 02, 2011Proceeding Mnj Dismissal on: 06/02/2011 09:01
Date: Jun 02, 2011Notice Of Appearance Mccalla Raymer For Plaintiff
Date: May 11, 2011Notice Of No Record Of Activity Hearing 6/2/11 9:00 S/Pivacek 3/14/11
Date: Mar 15, 2011Motion To Dismiss By Hilarion A Ramirez And Carmen Ramirez
Date: Oct 22, 2009Answer By Jeronimo Sanchez-Bautista
Date: Jul 31, 2009Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Carmen Ramirez 7/20/09
Date: Jul 28, 2009Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Jeronimo Sanchez Bautista 7/20/09
Date: Jul 28, 2009Affidavit Of Non-Service Of Summons Unknown Spouse
Date: Jul 28, 2009Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Hilarion A Ramirez 7/20/09
Date: Jul 28, 2009Real Property Valuation Sheet
Date: Jul 16, 2009Civil Cover Sheet
Date: Jul 16, 2009Complaint
Date: Jul 16, 2009Notice Of Lis Pendens
Date: Jul 16, 2009Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2016 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Brodie, Lauren L | |
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Final Disposition Form | |
April 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Voluntary Dismissal & Release of Lis Pendens Ocwen Loan Servicing, Llc,,Taylor Bean & Whitaker Mortgage,,Ramirez, Hilarion A,Ramirez, Carmen,Sanchez-Bautista, Jeronimo,Unknown Spouse,,Unknown Tenant, | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Cover Letter | |
October 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Order Granting Substitution of Party Plaintiff | |
October 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Motion for Substitution of Party Plaintiff | |
September 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Designation of E-Mail Address | |
June 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Per Administrative Order, case reassigned to Judge Cynthia A Pivacek | |
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Scheduled Judge Reassignment By Administrative Order. Effective: 07/01/2012, From Judge Ramiro Manalich To Judge Cynthia A Pivacek | |
November 03, 2011 | Docket Event | Default issued by clerk on Unknown Tenant, | |
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Non-Military Affidavit | |
October 26, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion for Default on Unknown Tenant, | |
October 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Dropping Party Unknown Spouse, | |
August 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Approving Stipulation For Substitution Of Counsel | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Correspondence From Counsel To Judge | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Consent To Stipulation Of Counsel | |
August 08, 2011 | Docket Event | Stipulation For Substitution Of Counsel | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Granting Motion For Substitution Of Party Plaintiff | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Correspondence From Counsel To Judge | |
July 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion For Substitution Of Party Plaintiff | |
July 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Division Judge Reassignment Order From: Cynthia A Pivacek To Ramiro Manalich Ordered By G Keith Cary On 06/13/2011 | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice Of Filing Demand Letter | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice Of Filing | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Bond $100.00 Surety (No Approval Fee Paid) | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Order Continuing Case For 60 Days | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Response To Defendant's Request For Verification Of Debt | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Proceeding Mnj Dismissal on: 06/02/2011 @ 09:01 | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Case Left Open 90 Days | |
June 02, 2011 | Docket Event | Presiding Judge: Monaco, Daniel R | |
May 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice Of Appearance Mccalla Raymer For Plaintiff | |
March 15, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice Of No Record Of Activity Hearing 6/2/11 9:00 S/Pivacek 3/14/11 | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice Of Appearance By Neil Morris Esq On Behalf Of Hilarion A Ramirez And Carmen Ramirez | |
October 22, 2009 | Docket Event |
FILE:image/png;64198;accounts/8cf60014-e58d-41fc-8095-a1b80e53d297/robots/cef5238b-1aef-488c-983b-baea864a2004/runs/d2b2f9ff-7a8b-4cf5-9d68-5199c63ea665/executions/527f2d92-31e6-4b30-8849-0d4654e51fb5/results/67a87449-1282-4ecb-853b-bd83d3750538/lines/67abe25e-5bcd-46cb-bd3e-cfb89685614a/Doc Motion To Dismiss By Hilarion A Ramirez And Carmen Ramirez |
|
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Answer By Jeronimo Sanchez-Bautista | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Carmen Ramirez 7/20/09 | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Jeronimo Sanchez Bautista 7/20/09 | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Non-Service Of Summons Unknown Spouse | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Hilarion A Ramirez 7/20/09 | |
July 28, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit Of Service Of Summons Unknown Tenant N/K/A Miguel A Valladarez 7/20/09 | |
July 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Summons Issued Jeronimo Sanchez-Bautista/Unknown Spouse/Hilarion A Ramirez/Carmen Ramirez/Unknown Tenants/Placed In Coffey Process Bin | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Real Property Valuation Sheet | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Cover Sheet | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice Of Lis Pendens | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Paid $10.00 Per Issuance Of Summons $50.00 | |
July 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Non-Homestead Foreclosure $50,001 - $249,999 |