Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
STATE OF FLORIDA vs. CHAMBERS, TARRIE ROCHEN
A case was filed against Chambers, Tarrie Rochen, in the jurisdiction of Clay County, FL. Judge FORBESS, RAYMOND EDWARD Jr presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
September 30, 2021
Last Refreshed
August 24, 2023
Filing Location
Clay County, FL
Practice Area
Criminal
Matter Type
Criminal Related (Civil)
Status
Active
Parties
Defendants
Case Documents
PAYMENT 53.00 RECEIPT 203321
Date: Jul 17, 2023PAYMENT 48.00 RECEIPT 197482
Date: Jun 08, 2023D6 CLEARED
Date: Jun 08, 2023DISPOSITION
Date: Mar 07, 2023D6 CLEARED
Date: Mar 06, 2023PAYMENT 30.00 RECEIPT 181946
Date: Mar 06, 2023AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENSE OR ADMISSION AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE
Date: Mar 06, 2023CITATION FILED
Date: Sep 30, 2021Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $53.00 RECEIPT #203321 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $48.00 RECEIPT #197482 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | RE-D6 ISSUED 06/08/2023 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $181.00 | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT PLAN AGREEMENT | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT INFORMATION FORM | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | RECALL CASE FROM COLLECTIONS - PERDUE BRANDON | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | CITATION UPDATE SENT TO TCATS - A1OZYBE | |
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event | DISPOSITION SENT TO TCATS - A1OZYBE | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | D6 CLEARED | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $30.00 RECEIPT #181946 | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF DEFENSE OR ADMISSION AND WAIVER OF APPEARANCE | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - PERDUE BRANDON | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | RECALL CASE FROM COLLECTIONS - MSB | |
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | SENT TO COLLECTIONS - MSB COLLECTION AGENCY | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 12/28/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED - PF - $285.00 | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | D-6 SUSPENSION SENT TO TCATS | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/30/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021TR018064 | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ADD SENT TO TCATS - A1OZYBE |